Geiler v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Bethany A Geiler
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: CSS-Social Security Administration
Case Number: 1:2020cv01168
Filed: April 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Michael M Mihm
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:402
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 3, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (VH, ilcd)
May 19, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER: Pro se Plaintiff submitted a #5 Proposed Summons for Issuance where she failed to provide addresses for Defendants. Plaintiff is DIRECTED to re-submit a new Summons for each of the following parties and include their addresses: Social Security Administration, Department of Justice, and U.S. Attorney's Office. The Clerk will PROVIDE Plaintiff with the addresses. Plaintiff is reminded that she is responsible to complete the Summons. Once the Clerk issues the Summons, Plaintiff will also be responsible for serving the Summons and #1 Complaint in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(i). Plaintiff is not to fill out the second page titled "Proof of Service" until after the parties have been served with the Summons and #1 Complaint. The Clerk is further DIRECTED to STRIKE #5 Proposed Summons. Entered by Judge Michael M. Mihm on 5/19/2020. (NRL, ilcd)
May 18, 2020 Filing 5 STRICKEN PURSUANT TO TEXT ORDER ENTERED ON 5/19/2020-NOTICE: Proposed summons (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(VH, ilcd) Modified on 5/19/2020 (VH, ilcd).
May 15, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER: The Court is in receipt of Plaintiff's #4 Motion to Request Counsel. Unlike in criminal cases, parties in civil cases have no right to a lawyer. See Zarnes v. Rhodes, 64 F.3d 285, 288 (7th Cir. 1995). The federal in forma pauperis statute provides that "[a] court may request an attorney to represent any person unable to afford counsel." 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(1). On April 24, 2020, however, Plaintiff paid the $400 filing fee in full. She has not shown that she is unable to afford counsel. Therefore, section 1915(e)(1)'s provision does not apply. Plaintiff has also submitted letters from attorneys' offices; however, one letter is simply an appointment confirmation from May 2019, and the other indicates that the attorney may be willing to help if Plaintiff provided the office with a CD of her medical records. Plaintiff has not demonstrated that her attempts to seek counsel have been precluded. For these reasons, Plaintiff's #4 Motion to Request Counsel is DENIED. Entered by Judge Michael M. Mihm on 5/15/2020. (NRL, ilcd)
May 12, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER: Plaintiff submitted a #3 Proposed Summons for Issuance where she listed herself incorrectly as the Defendant in this matter. Defendant is Commissioner of Social Security. Plaintiff is DIRECTED to re-submit a new Summons with the correct parties listed. The Clerk of the Court is also DIRECTED to strike #3 Proposed Summons for Issuance. Entered by Judge Michael M. Mihm on 5/12/2020. (NRL, ilcd)
May 11, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to Request Counsel by Plaintiff Bethany A Geiler. Responses due by 5/26/2020 (VH, ilcd)
May 11, 2020 Filing 3 STRICKEN PURSUANT TO TEXT ORDER ENTERED ON5/12/2020-NOTICE: Proposed Summons for Issuance. (VH, ilcd) Modified on 5/12/2020 (VH, ilcd).
May 1, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER: On April 24, 2020, pro se Plaintiff filed the $400 filing fee in this case. Plaintiff is DIRECTED to provide the Clerk's Office with a Summons for issuance pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(b). Summons can be found on https://www.ilcd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms under "Social Security Summons." The Clerk's Office will then return the Summons back to Plaintiff so that she can effectuate service pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(i). Entered by Judge Michael M. Mihm on 5/1/2020. (NRL, ilcd)
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER: DENYING Plaintiff's #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis as MOOT. On April 22, 2020, Plaintiff filed her #2 Motion, and on April 24, 2020, Plaintiff paid the full $400.00 filing fee. Therefore, Plaintiff's #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis is MOOT. Entered by Judge Michael M. Mihm on 4/24/2020. (NRL, ilcd)
April 24, 2020 Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 14626036972 (FDS, ilcd)
April 22, 2020 Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley no longer assigned to case. (VH, ilcd)
April 22, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Bethany A Geiler. Responses due by 5/6/2020 (VH, ilcd)
April 22, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Bethany A Geiler. (Attachments: #1 Ex 1, #2 Ex 2, #3 Ex 3, #4 Ex 4, #5 Ex 5, #6 Ex 6)(VH, ilcd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Geiler v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: CSS-Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bethany A Geiler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?