Sherman v. Brandt Industries USA LTD
Plaintiff: Joseph Sherman
Defendant: Brandt Industries USA LTD
Case Number: 1:2020cv01185
Filed: May 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Jonathan E Hawley
Referring Judge: Michael M Mihm
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Keith J Braskich on behalf of Brandt Industries USA LTD (Braskich, Keith)
June 18, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #6 unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Dft Brandt Industries USA LTD answer due 7/24/2020. Entered by Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley on 6/18/20. (WG, ilcd)
June 17, 2020 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF INTEREST pursuant to Local Rule 11.3 by Brandt Industries USA LTD. (Lubben, David)
June 17, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #4 Amended Complaint by Defendant Brandt Industries USA LTD. Responses due by 7/1/2020 (Lubben, David)
June 15, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joseph Sherman. Brandt Industries USA LTD served on 6/3/2020, answer due 6/24/2020. (Keogh, Keith)
May 18, 2020 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Brandt Industries USA LTD, filed by Joseph Sherman.(Keogh, Keith)
May 12, 2020 Set Deadline: Amended Pleadings due by 5/26/2020. (VH, ilcd)
May 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER re subject matter jurisdiction. Entered by Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley on 5/12/2020. (KZ, ilcd)
May 12, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Brandt Industries USA LTD. (RK, ilcd)
May 11, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Brandt Industries USA LTD ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0753-3371034.), filed by Joseph Sherman. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons to be issued)(Keogh, Keith)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sherman v. Brandt Industries USA LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brandt Industries USA LTD
Represented By: Keith J Braskich
Represented By: David G Lubben
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Sherman
Represented By: Keith James Keogh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?