Nowlin et al v. Pritzker
Plaintiff: Peter Ptak, Karla Boldt, Quinton S Mister, Houdinis Spirits, Jesse Kadera, Caroline Szwajlik, Bonofide Cleaning, LLC, James Shipley, Melissa L Sharma, Cheryl A Thompson, Dawn Nowlin, In Style Hair Studio, April Schweitzer, Rachel M Olivares, Elaine Conforti and Karen's Emergency Services
Defendant: Jay Robert Pritzker
Case Number: 1:2020cv01229
Filed: June 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Jonathan E Hawley
Referring Judge: Michael M Mihm
2 Judge: James E Shadid
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Judge James E. Shadid on 8/12/2020. Granting Parties' #12 Joint Motion for Scheduling Order. Defendants have up until and including 8/21/2020 to file a Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint and Response to Plaintiffs' Motions for TRO and Preliminary Injunction. Plaintiffs have up until and including 9/4/2020 to seek leave to file a Reply in Support of their Motions for TRO and Preliminary Injunction and up until and including 9/11/2020 to file a Reply to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss the Complaint. Status Conference set for 8/12/2020 at 1:30 PM by video conference from Peoria before Judge James E. Shadid is vacated.(JRK, ilcd)
August 11, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for Order | Joint Motion for Scheduling Order by Defendant Jay Robert Pritzker. Responses due by 8/25/2020 (VanDam, Jeffrey)
August 11, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Jeffrey J VanDam on behalf of Jay Robert Pritzker (VanDam, Jeffrey)
August 10, 2020 Filing 10 Status Conference set for 8/12/2020 at 01:30 PM by video conference from Peoria (conference information attached as main document herein) before Judge James E. Shadid Entered by Judge James E. Shadid on 8/10/2020. (CG, ilcd)
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER: entered by Judge Michael M. Mihm on 8/10/2020: The hearing and rulings on the Plaintiffs Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction, and any related matters, are transferred to Judge James E. Shadid due to the temporary unavailability of Judge Michael M. Mihm. Entered by Judge Michael M. Mihm on 8/10/2020. (KH1, ilcd)
August 10, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Pursuant to Summons Returned on 8/7/2020 as executed on Executed on 7/14/2020, Jay Robert Pritzker answer due 8/4/2020. (JRK, ilcd)
August 10, 2020 Judge James E. Shadid added. Judge Michael M. Mihm no longer assigned to case. (AEM, ilcd)
August 7, 2020 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM re #7 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction by Karla Boldt, Bonofide Cleaning, LLC, Elaine Conforti, Houdinis Spirits, In Style Hair Studio, Jesse Kadera, Karen's Emergency Services, Quinton S Mister, Dawn Nowlin, Rachel M Olivares, Peter Ptak, April Schweitzer, Melissa L Sharma, James Shipley, Caroline Szwajlik, Cheryl A Thompson. (Kreamer, John)
August 7, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiffs Karla Boldt, Bonofide Cleaning, LLC, Elaine Conforti, Houdinis Spirits, In Style Hair Studio, Jesse Kadera, Karen's Emergency Services, Quinton S Mister, Dawn Nowlin, Rachel M Olivares, Peter Ptak, April Schweitzer, Melissa L Sharma, James Shipley, Caroline Szwajlik, Cheryl A Thompson. Responses due by 8/21/2020 (Kreamer, John)
August 7, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED filed as AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint, Exhibits A-H served on Jay Robert Pritzker by Monti Lindsey on 07/14/2020, filed by Karla Boldt, Bonofide Cleaning, LLC, Elaine Conforti, Houdinis Spirits, In Style Hair Studio, Jesse Kadera, Karen's Emergency Services, Quinton S Mister, Dawn Nowlin, Rachel M Olivares, Peter Ptak, April Schweitzer, Melissa L Sharma, James Shipley, Caroline Szwajlik, Cheryl A Thompson. (Kreamer, John) Modified on 8/10/2020 to clarify document filed(JRK, ilcd).
June 29, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #5 the Plaintiff's Motion to Appoint Special Process Server. Entered by Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley on 6/29/2020. (KZ, ilcd)
June 26, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Appoint Special Process Server by Plaintiffs Karla Boldt, Bonofide Cleaning, LLC, Elaine Conforti, Houdinis Spirits, In Style Hair Studio, Jesse Kadera, Karen's Emergency Services, Quinton S Mister, Dawn Nowlin, Rachel M Olivares, Peter Ptak, April Schweitzer, Melissa L Sharma, James Shipley, Caroline Szwajlik, Cheryl A Thompson. Responses due by 7/10/2020 (Kreamer, John)
June 19, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Joseph E Urani on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Urani, Joseph)
June 16, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Jay Robert Pritzker. (JRK, ilcd)
June 15, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Jay Robert Pritzker ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0753-3398989.), filed by In Style Hair Studio, Jesse Kadera, Houdinis Spirits, Dawn Nowlin, Bonofide Cleaning, LLC, Quinton S Mister, Melissa L Sharma, Karla Boldt, James Shipley, Cheryl A Thompson, Karen's Emergency Services, Caroline Szwajlik, Peter Ptak, Rachel M Olivares, Elaine Conforti, April Schweitzer. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H)(Kreamer, John)
June 15, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by John Christopher Kreamer on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Kreamer, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nowlin et al v. Pritzker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Ptak
Represented By: John Christopher Kreamer
Represented By: Joseph E Urani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karla Boldt
Represented By: John Christopher Kreamer
Represented By: Joseph E Urani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Quinton S Mister
Represented By: John Christopher Kreamer
Represented By: Joseph E Urani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Houdinis Spirits
Represented By: John Christopher Kreamer
Represented By: Joseph E Urani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesse Kadera
Represented By: John Christopher Kreamer
Represented By: Joseph E Urani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Caroline Szwajlik
Represented By: John Christopher Kreamer
Represented By: Joseph E Urani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bonofide Cleaning, LLC
Represented By: John Christopher Kreamer
Represented By: Joseph E Urani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Shipley
Represented By: John Christopher Kreamer
Represented By: Joseph E Urani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melissa L Sharma
Represented By: John Christopher Kreamer
Represented By: Joseph E Urani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cheryl A Thompson
Represented By: John Christopher Kreamer
Represented By: Joseph E Urani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dawn Nowlin
Represented By: John Christopher Kreamer
Represented By: Joseph E Urani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: In Style Hair Studio
Represented By: John Christopher Kreamer
Represented By: Joseph E Urani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: April Schweitzer
Represented By: John Christopher Kreamer
Represented By: Joseph E Urani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rachel M Olivares
Represented By: John Christopher Kreamer
Represented By: Joseph E Urani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elaine Conforti
Represented By: John Christopher Kreamer
Represented By: Joseph E Urani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen's Emergency Services
Represented By: John Christopher Kreamer
Represented By: Joseph E Urani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jay Robert Pritzker
Represented By: Jeffrey J VanDam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?