Taylor v. Anglin et al
Plaintiff: Kennado K Taylor
Defendant: Crystal Carlson, Leonta Jackson, . Renzi, Colin Stirling Bruce, . Prtro, . Howell, Judge JES, Judge SEM, . Gaskell, Joshua Anglin, Judge MMM, Karl Webber and Sara Darrow
Case Number: 1:2020cv01240
Filed: June 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Harold A Baker
Referring Judge: Sara Darrow
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison Conditions
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE - Declaration of Kennado Taylor. (FDS, ilcd)
August 11, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for protection (Declaration of Kennado K Taylor) by Plaintiff Kennado K Taylor. Responses due by 8/25/2020 (KB, ilcd)
July 22, 2020 Filing 10 WAIVERS OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Kennado K Taylor. Joshua Anglin waiver sent on 7/8/2020, answer due 9/8/2020; Leonta Jackson waiver sent on 7/8/2020, answer due 9/8/2020. (SAG, ilcd)
July 8, 2020 Filing 9 REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF SERVICE and Notice of Lawsuit sent to Joshua Anglin, Leonta Jackson on 7/8/2020. (Attachments: #1 waiver 2)(SAG, ilcd)
July 8, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #3 Petition to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Plaintiff's trust fund ledgers indicate he has no funds to make an initial partial payment of the filing fee. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1915(b)(4), the initial partial filing fee is waived. The agency having custody of Plaintiff is directed to make monthly payments of 20 percent of the preceding month's income credited to Plaintiff's account to the Clerk of Court. Income includes all deposits from any source. The agency having custody of the plaintiff shall forward these payments each time Plaintiff's account exceeds $10, until the filing fee of $350 is paid in full. The Clerk is directed to mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff's place of confinement, to the attention of the Trust Fund Office. Entered by Judge Harold A. Baker on 7/8/2020. (SAG, ilcd)
July 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 HIPAA QUALIFIED PROTECTIVE ORDER entered by Judge Harold A. Baker on 7/8/2020. (SAG, ilcd)
July 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MERIT REVIEW ORDER entered by Judge Harold A. Baker on 7/8/2020. It is therefore ordered: 1. Pursuant to its merit review of the Complaint under 28 U.S.C. 1915A, the court finds that the plaintiff states an Eighth Amendment claim for failure to protect from harm against Defendants Anglin and Jackson. Any additional claims shall not be included in the case, except at the court's discretion on motion by a party for good cause shown or pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 15. SEE FULL WRITTEN ORDER.(SAG, ilcd) (Main Document 7 replaced on 7/8/2020) (SAG, ilcd).
June 26, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Chief Judge Sara Darrow on 6/26/2020. This case is re-assigned to Judge Harold A. Baker for all further proceedings. (SAG, ilcd)
June 25, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiff Kennado K Taylor. Responses due by 7/9/2020 (SAG, ilcd)
June 25, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Request Counsel by Plaintiff Kennado K Taylor. Responses due by 7/9/2020 (SAG, ilcd)
June 25, 2020 Filing 4 +++ PRISONER TRUST FUND LEDGER. by Kennado K Taylor (SAG, ilcd)
June 25, 2020 Filing 3 PETITION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, filed by Kennado K Taylor.(SAG, ilcd)
June 25, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF CASE OPENING. Please be advised that your case has been assigned to Chief Judge Sara Darrow. Effective immediately, all documents should be mailed or scanned to the Rock Island Division, 131 E 4th Street, Davenport, IA 52801. Merit Review Deadline set for 7/15/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice Regarding Privacy Issues)(SAG, ilcd)
June 25, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Kennado K Taylor.(SAG, ilcd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Taylor v. Anglin et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crystal Carlson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leonta Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: . Renzi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colin Stirling Bruce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: . Prtro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: . Howell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judge JES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judge SEM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: . Gaskell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joshua Anglin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judge MMM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karl Webber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sara Darrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kennado K Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?