Jackson v. Powers
Plaintiff: Rasheem Jackson
Defendant: Wexford, Justin Hammers and . Powers
Case Number: 1:2020cv01246
Filed: June 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Office: Peoria Office
Presiding Judge: Sara Darrow
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison Conditions
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2020 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Nurse Powers. Waiver sent on 7/30/2020, answer due 9/28/2020. (JRK, ilcd)
July 30, 2020 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF SERVICE and Notice of Lawsuit sent to. Powers on 7/30/2020. (SAG, ilcd)
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 HIPAA QUALIFIED PROTECTIVE ORDER entered by Judge Harold A. Baker on 7/30/2020. (SAG, ilcd)
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MERIT REVIEW ORDER entered by Judge Harold A. Baker on 7/30/2020. It is therefore ordered: 1. Pursuant to its merit review of the Complaint under 28 U.S.C. 1915A, the court finds that the plaintiff states an Eighth Amendment claim for deliberate indifference to a serious medical need against Defendant Powers. Any additional claims shall not be included in the case, except at the court's discretion on motion by a party for good cause shown or pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 15. SEE FULL WRITTEN ORDER.(SAG, ilcd)
July 30, 2020 Prisoner Initial Partial Filing Fee received 7/30/2020, in the amount of $ 55.73; receipt number 14626038185 (RK, ilcd)
June 29, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #3 Petition to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1915(b)(1), Plaintiff is assessed an initial partial filing fee of $55.73. The agency having custody of Plaintiff is directed to forward the initial partial filing fee from Plaintiff's account to the Clerk of Court. After payment of the initial partial filing fee (or immediately if no funds are available for that payment) the agency having custody of Plaintiff is directed to make monthly payments of 20 percent of the preceding month's income credited to Plaintiff's account to the Clerk of Court. Income includes all deposits from any source. The agency having custody of the plaintiff shall forward these payments each time Plaintiff's account exceeds $10, until the filing fee of $350 is paid in full. The Clerk is directed to mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff's place of confinement, to the attention of the Trust Fund Office. Entered by Chief Judge Sara Darrow on 6/29/2020. (SAG, ilcd)
June 29, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF CASE OPENING. Please be advised that your case has been assigned to Chief Judge Sara Darrow. Effective immediately, all documents should be mailed or scanned to the Rock Island Division, 131 E 4th Street, Davenport, IA 52801. Merit Review Deadline set for 7/20/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice Regarding Privacy Issues)(SAG, ilcd)
June 26, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Request Counsel by Plaintiff Rasheem Jackson. Responses due by 7/10/2020 (SAG, ilcd)
June 26, 2020 Filing 4 +++ PRISONER TRUST FUND LEDGER. by Rasheem Jackson (SAG, ilcd)
June 26, 2020 Filing 3 PETITION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, filed by Rasheem Jackson.(SAG, ilcd)
June 26, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Rasheem Jackson.(SAG, ilcd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson v. Powers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rasheem Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wexford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justin Hammers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: . Powers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?