Vann v. Entzel
Petitioner: Rayvell Vann
Respondent: F. Entzel
Case Number: 1:2020cv01249
Filed: July 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Michael M Mihm
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 24, 2020 Filing 2 JUDGMENT (JRK, ilcd)
July 22, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER: DISMISSING Petitioners #1 Petition for a Writ of Habeas Corpus Under 28 U.S.C. 2241. Plaintiffs Petition is challenging the validity of his conviction or sentence imposed by the U.S. District Court of New Mexico, which should be brought under 28 U.S.C. 2255 and must be filed in the court that imposed the sentence. As a result, this Court is neither the proper venue nor has jurisdiction to address petitioners claim challenging the validity of his conviction and/or the sentence imposed and his #1 Petition is DISMISSED. The Clerk is directed to close this case. Entered by Judge Michael M. Mihm on 7/22/2020.(KH1, ilcd)
July 20, 2020 Filing fee: $5.00, receipt number 14626038093. (JS, ilcd)
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Judge Michael M. Mihm on 7/2/2020 directing the Petitioner to pay the filing fee of $5.00 within 30 days of this Order. If Petitioner is unable to pay the required filing fee, he may file a Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. If Petitioner fails to pay the required filing fee or file a Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis within 30 days, his Petition under 28 U.S.C. 2241 for Writ of Habeas #1 will be dismissed without prejudice by this court. (Miscellaneous Deadline set for 8/3/2020)(JRK, ilcd)
July 1, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Rayvell Vann.(JRK, ilcd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vann v. Entzel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: F. Entzel
Represented By: W. Scott Simpson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Rayvell Vann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?