Culp v. Entzel
Petitioner: Edwin Culp
Respondent: Frederick Entzel
Case Number: 1:2020cv01250
Filed: July 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: James E Shadid
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Text Order: The motion to substitute Attorney Boyle for Attorney Simpson is granted. [3.] The clerk is directed to terminate Attorney Simpson. Respondents motion to extend the deadline for filing a response to the petition is granted. [4.] The response deadline is extended to September 8, 2020. Entered by Judge James E. Shadid on 8/28/2020. (AEM, ilcd)
August 27, 2020 Filing 4 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Respondent Frederick Entzel. Responses due by 9/10/2020 (Boyle, Katherine)
August 20, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION to Substitute Attorney, W. Scott Simpson to be replaced by Katherine V. Boyle, by Respondent Frederick Entzel. Responses due by 9/3/2020 (Boyle, Katherine)
August 10, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 8/27/2020 (JRK, ilcd)
August 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER re #1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Edwin Culp. Entered by Judge James E. Shadid on 8/6/20. The Court has reviewed the Petition pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2243, 2241, and Rule 4 of the Rules Governing Section 2254 Proceedings for the United States District Courts and finds that summary dismissal is not warranted. SEE FULL WRITTEN ORDER (FDS, ilcd)
July 16, 2020 Filing fee: $5.00, receipt number 14626038078. (JS, ilcd)
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER: Petitioner has filed a Petition for Habeas Corpus Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2241. Petitioner is directed to either pay the $5 filing fee or provide the Court with a signed Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs that also includes a copy of his trust fund ledger, certified by the appropriate institutional officer, showing all receipts, expenditures and balances for the last six months. Petitioner shall do so on or before July 31, 2020, or the Court will dismiss the case without prejudice for failure to pay the filing fee. The Clerk is directed to send Petitioner a copy of the forms for proceeding in forma pauperis. Entered by Judge James E. Shadid on 7/6/20. (FDS, ilcd)
July 1, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241) filed by Edwin Culp.(FDS, ilcd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Culp v. Entzel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Edwin Culp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Frederick Entzel
Represented By: W. Scott Simpson
Represented By: Katherine Virginia Boyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?