Bell v. Hughes et al
Plaintiff: Lakendra Bell
Defendant: McLean County Detention Facility, Melinda Fuller, . Proctor, Jon Sandage, Jackie Mathics, Jamey Kessinger, . Kerr, Tori Bevins, . Winans and . Hughes
Case Number: 1:2020cv01261
Filed: July 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Office: Peoria Office
Presiding Judge: Sara Darrow
Referring Judge: Jonathan E Hawley
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison Conditions
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 18, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held 8/18/20 before Judge Harold A. Baker. Appearance on behalf of the Plaintiff by Linda Watson. No appearance by the Plaintiff. Status hearing held. Staff at the McLean County Detention Center advise that Ms. Bell did not want to participate in the phone conference. Plaintiff's counsel to meet with her and advise the court on when a hearing can be set in the future. (Tape #UR-C 10:04 AM.) (SKR, ilcd)
August 13, 2020 Prisoner Initial Partial Filing Fee received 8/13/2020, in the amount of $15.60; receipt number 14626038286. (JS, ilcd)
August 12, 2020 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Lakendra Bell. Melinda Fuller waiver sent on 7/30/2020, answer due 9/28/2020. (AEM, ilcd)
August 12, 2020 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Lakendra Bell.. Hughes waiver sent on 7/30/2020, answer due 9/28/2020. (AEM, ilcd)
August 3, 2020 Filing 12 TELEPHONE WRIT issued to McLean Co. Jail for hearing set 8/18/2020 at 10:00 a.m. (SAG, ilcd)
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Judge Harold A. Baker on 8/3/2020. The matter is set for telephone status conference on August 18, 2020, at 10:00 a.m. to discuss the recent appointment of counsel to represent Plaintiff. Clerk is directed to issue a telephone writ for Plaintiff's appearance at the hearing. Plaintiff's counsel and jail officials shall call 571-353-2300, then enter 736094167# to join the conference.(SAG, ilcd)
August 3, 2020 Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley added. (SAG, ilcd)
August 3, 2020 Filing 11 Remark: Letter electronically sent to Atty Linda Watson along with the following Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet, #2 Plan for Recruitment of Counsel. Also on this date, a copy of the docket sheet and text order were conventionally mailed to plaintiff at McLean County Jail. (DK, ilcd)
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER Entered by Judge Harold A. Baker on 8/3/2020. Attorney Linda Watson has graciously accepted recruitment as pro bono counsel for plaintiff Lakendra Bell and agrees to comply with this Court's Plan for Recruitment of Counsel. The Clerk is directed to add Ms. Watson as counsel for plaintiff.(DK, ilcd)
July 30, 2020 Filing 10 REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF SERVICE and Notice of Lawsuit sent to. Hughes, Melinda Fuller on 7/30/2020. (Attachments: #1 waiver 2)(SAG, ilcd) (Attachment 1 replaced on 7/30/2020) (SAG, ilcd).
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 HIPAA QUALIFIED PROTECTIVE ORDER entered by Judge Harold A. Baker on 7/30/2020. (SAG, ilcd)
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MERIT REVIEW ORDER entered by Judge Harold A. Baker on 7/30/2020. It is therefore ordered: 1. Pursuant to its merit review of the Complaint under 28 U.S.C. 1915A, the court finds that the plaintiff states a Fourteenth Amendment claim against Defendants Hughes and Fuller for failure to provide mental health treatment and inhumane conditions of confinement against the named defendants. Any additional claims shall not be included in the case, except at the court's discretion on motion by a party for good cause shown or pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 15. SEE FULL WRITTEN ORDER.(SAG, ilcd)
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #3 Petition to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1915(b)(1), Plaintiff is assessed an initial partial filing fee of $2.60. The agency having custody of Plaintiff is directed to forward the initial partial filing fee from Plaintiff's account to the Clerk of Court. After payment of the initial partial filing fee (or immediately if no funds are available for that payment) the agency having custody of Plaintiff is directed to make monthly payments of 20 percent of the preceding month's income credited to Plaintiff's account to the Clerk of Court. Income includes all deposits from any source. The agency having custody of the plaintiff shall forward these payments each time Plaintiff's account exceeds $10, until the filing fee of $350 is paid in full. The Clerk is directed to mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff's place of confinement, to the attention of the Trust Fund Office. Entered by Chief Judge Sara Darrow on 7/28/2020. (SAG, ilcd)
July 27, 2020 Filing 7 +++ PRISONER TRUST FUND LEDGER. by Lakendra Bell (JRK, ilcd)
July 21, 2020 Filing 6 Letter from Clerk of Court to McLean Co. Detention Center requesting ledgers 1/9/20 through 7/9/20 (SAG, ilcd)
July 21, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held 7/21/20 before Judge Harold A. Baker. Appearance by the Plaintiff Lakendra Bell. Merit Review hearing held by phone. The Plaintiff agrees that she filed the lawsuit. On the Court's own motion, the court will make attempts to find counsel for the Plaintiff. Written order to be entered. (Court Reporter LC.) (SKR, ilcd)
July 13, 2020 Filing 5 TELEPHONE WRIT issued to McLean Co. Jail for hearing set 7/21/2020 at 10:00 a.m. (SAG, ilcd)
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Judge Harold A. Baker on 7/13/2020. A merit review hearing is set for 7/21/2020 at 10:00 a.m., by telephone conference call from Urbana. The clerk is directed to issue a writ to insure plaintiff's appearance at this merit review hearing.(SAG, ilcd)
July 10, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF CASE OPENING. Please be advised that your case has been assigned to Chief Judge Sara Darrow. Effective immediately, all documents should be mailed or scanned to the Rock Island Division, 131 E 4th Street, Davenport, IA 52801. Merit Review Deadline set for 7/30/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice Regarding Privacy Issues)(SAG, ilcd)
July 9, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to Request Counsel by Plaintiff Lakendra Bell. Responses due by 7/23/2020 (SAG, ilcd)
July 9, 2020 Filing 3 PETITION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, filed by Lakendra Bell.(SAG, ilcd)
July 9, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Lakendra Bell.(SAG, ilcd) Modified on 7/10/2020 to correct date of filing (SAG, ilcd).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bell v. Hughes et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McLean County Detention Facility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melinda Fuller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: . Proctor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jon Sandage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jackie Mathics
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jamey Kessinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: . Kerr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tori Bevins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: . Winans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: . Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lakendra Bell
Represented By: Linda J Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?