Taylor v. Corey et al
Plaintiff: Kennado K Taylor
Defendant: . Jeffrod, . Miller, . Biros, . Corey and . Kievles
Case Number: 1:2020cv01297
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Harold A Baker
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison Conditions
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 2, 2020 Filing 18 PLRA FEE NOTICE AND ORDER of U S Court of Appeals as to #12 Notice of Appeal filed by Kennado K Taylor (MAS, ilcd)
September 2, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Docketing Record on Appeal from U S Court of Appeals regarding #12 Notice of Appeal filed by Kennado K Taylor. U S Court of Appeals Case Number is 20-2671 (Attachment: #1 USCA Notice of Case Opening)(MAS, ilcd)
September 2, 2020 Filing 16 +++ PRISONER TRUST FUND LEDGER by Kennado K Taylor. (KE, ilcd)
September 2, 2020 Filing 15 Short Record of Appeal Sent to US Court of Appeals re #12 Notice of Appeal (TK, ilcd)
September 2, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Kennado K Taylor. Responses due by 9/16/2020 (TK, ilcd) (Main Document 14 replaced on 9/3/2020) (KE, ilcd).
September 2, 2020 Filing 13 DOCKETING STATEMENT by Kennado K Taylor re #12 Notice of Appeal (TK, ilcd)
September 2, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to Text Order on Petition to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Kennado K Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits)(TK, ilcd)
August 27, 2020 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT regarding #7 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Proceed IFP on Appeal by Kennado K Taylor. (MAS, ilcd)
August 25, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION to Request Counsel by Plaintiff Kennado K Taylor. Responses due by 9/8/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(KE, ilcd)
August 25, 2020 Filing 10 +++ PRISONER TRUST FUND LEDGER by Kennado K Taylor. (KE, ilcd)
August 25, 2020 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM in Support re #7 for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis filed by Plaintiff Kennado K Taylor. (KE, ilcd)
August 25, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis filed by Plaintiff Kennado K Taylor. (MAS, ilcd) Modified on 9/1/2020 to correct title. (KE, ilcd). (Main Document 7 replaced on 9/1/2020) (KE, ilcd).
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Judge Harold A. Baker on 8/19/2020. Plaintiff's petition to proceed in forma pauperis is denied #3 because Plaintiff has accumulated more than three strikes under 28 U.S.C. Sec 1915(g) and because Plaintiff's allegations of imminent harm are already proceedings in case 20-cv-1245. This case is dismissed without prejudice for failure to pay the filing fee. Pending motions are moot. [4, 6]. (KE, ilcd)
August 18, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiff Kennado K Taylor. Responses due by 9/1/2020 (SAG, ilcd)
August 18, 2020 Filing 5 +++ PRISONER TRUST FUND LEDGER. by Kennado K Taylor (SAG, ilcd)
August 18, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to Request Counsel by Plaintiff Kennado K Taylor. Responses due by 9/1/2020 (SAG, ilcd)
August 18, 2020 Filing 3 PETITION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, filed by Kennado K Taylor.(SAG, ilcd)
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF CASE OPENING. Please be advised that your case has been assigned to Judge Harold A. Baker. Effective immediately, all documents should be mailed or scanned to the Springfield Division, 600 E Monroe, Springfield,IL 62701.Merit Review Deadline set for 9/8/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice Regarding Privacy Issues)(SAG, ilcd)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Kennado K Taylor.(SAG, ilcd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Taylor v. Corey et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: . Jeffrod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: . Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: . Biros
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: . Corey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: . Kievles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kennado K Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?