Optum, Inc. v. Optim Dental LLC et al
Plaintiff: Optum, Inc.
Defendant: Optim Dental-1, LLC, Optim Dental Peoria-1 LLC, Srinivas Durshanapalli, Optim Dental Bloomington LLC and Optim Dental LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv01308
Filed: August 31, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Jonathan E Hawley
Referring Judge: James E Shadid
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 28, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. All Defendants to answer by 11/10/2020. Entered by Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley on 10/28/20. (WG, ilcd)
October 27, 2020 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF INTEREST pursuant to Local Rule 11.3 by Srinivas Durshanapalli, Optim Dental Bloomington LLC, Optim Dental LLC, Optim Dental Peoria-1 LLC, Optim Dental-1, LLC. (Hanauer, Robert)
October 27, 2020 Filing 14 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Plead by Defendants Srinivas Durshanapalli, Optim Dental Bloomington LLC, Optim Dental LLC, Optim Dental Peoria-1 LLC, Optim Dental-1, LLC. Responses due by 11/10/2020 (Hanauer, Robert)
October 27, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Robert J Hanauer on behalf of All Defendants (Hanauer, Robert)
October 14, 2020 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Optum, Inc.. Srinivas Durshanapalli served on 10/6/2020, answer due 10/27/2020. (Lubben, David)
October 14, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Optum, Inc.. Optim Dental Peoria-1 LLC served on 10/6/2020, answer due 10/27/2020. (Lubben, David)
October 14, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Optum, Inc.. Optim Dental LLC served on 10/6/2020, answer due 10/27/2020. (Lubben, David)
October 14, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Optum, Inc.. Optim Dental-1, LLC served on 10/6/2020, answer due 10/27/2020. (Lubben, David)
October 14, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Optum, Inc.. Optim Dental Bloomington LLC served on 10/6/2020, answer due 10/27/2020. (Lubben, David)
October 14, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE Regarding Service of Process on all Defendants on October 6 2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit)(Lubben, David)
September 30, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by David G Lubben on behalf of Optum, Inc. (Lubben, David)
September 28, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Srinivas Durshanapalli, Optim Dental Bloomington LLC, Optim Dental LLC, Optim Dental Peoria-1 LLC, Optim Dental-1, LLC. (JS, ilcd)
September 28, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by David G Lubben on behalf of Optum, Inc. (Lubben, David)
September 1, 2020 Filing 3 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding Trademark by Optum, Inc. (VH, ilcd)
August 31, 2020 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTEREST pursuant to Local Rule 11.3 by Optum, Inc.. (Meyerhoff, Lisa)
August 31, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0753-3462988.), filed by Optum, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Meyerhoff, Lisa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Optum, Inc. v. Optim Dental LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Optim Dental-1, LLC
Represented By: Robert J Hanauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Optim Dental Peoria-1 LLC
Represented By: Robert J Hanauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Srinivas Durshanapalli
Represented By: Robert J Hanauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Optim Dental Bloomington LLC
Represented By: Robert J Hanauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Optim Dental LLC
Represented By: Robert J Hanauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Optum, Inc.
Represented By: Lisa Hayes Meyerhoff
Represented By: David G Lubben
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?