Sewell v. Entzel
Petitioner: Jimmy L Sewell
Respondent: Entzel
Case Number: 1:2020cv01321
Filed: September 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Colin Stirling Bruce
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 13, 2020 Filing 3 AMENDED PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Jimmy L Sewell. (Attachments: #1 exhibits)(SKR, ilcd)
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER Entered by Judge Colin Stirling Bruce on 10/6/20. Petitioner has filed a Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus under 28 U.S.C. Section 2241 #1 , raising claims that the sentencing court erroneously applied the Section 851 sentencing enhancement. However, a review of the docket in his criminal case in the Northern District of Indiana, 07-cr-00053, reveals that Petitioner has brought this same claim in a motion to vacate under 28 U.S.C. Section 2255, to which the government has already been ordered to respond. Pursuing the identical claim under 2255 and 2241 simultaneously could result in unnecessary and potentially duplicative litigation. However, rather than dismiss his 2241 petition, which may provide an alternative basis for collateral review if the sentencing court finds it cannot address his claim on the merits within 2255, the Court STAYS this proceeding, pending the outcome of Petitioner's 2255 motion. Petitioner is ORDERED to update the Court within 60 days of a final order in his 2255 proceedings. ( Other Deadline set for 12/4/2020.) (SKR, ilcd)
September 14, 2020 Filing fee: $5.00, receipt number 14626038501. (JS, ilcd)
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER Entered by Judge Colin Stirling Bruce on 9/11/20 directing the Petitioner to pay the filing fee of $5.00 within 30 days of this Order. If Petitioner is unable to pay the required filing fee, he may file a Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. If Petitioner fails to pay the requiredfiling fee or file a Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis within 30 days, his Petition under 28 U.S.C. Section 2241 for Writ of Habeas #1 will be dismissed without prejudice by this court. ( Miscellaneous Deadline 10/9/2020)(SKR, ilcd)
September 10, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to Request Counsel by Petitioner Jimmy L Sewell. Responses due by 9/25/2020 (SKR, ilcd) Modified on 9/11/2020 to correct filing date (SKR, ilcd).
September 10, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Jimmy L Sewell. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibits)(SKR, ilcd) Modified on 9/11/2020 to correct filing date(SKR, ilcd).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sewell v. Entzel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jimmy L Sewell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Entzel
Represented By: W. Scott Simpson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?