Faulkner v. United States of America
Petitioner: James A Faulkner
Respondent: United States of America
Case Number: 1:2020cv01339
Filed: October 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Joe Billy McDade
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER entered by Judge Joe Billy McDade on 10/22/2020 re #1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by James A Faulkner: 1. Respondent SHALL file an answer, motion, or other responsive pleading within sixty (60) days of this Order. Respondent should address any facts that would establish whether Petitioner's claims are untimely or procedurally barred. In addition, Respondent should address the merits of Petitioner's claims and otherwise fully comply with Rule 5 of the Rules Governing 2255 Proceedings for the United States District Courts. 2. Petitioner MAY file a reply to Respondents response within twenty-one (21) days of being served with the response. 3. Petitioner SHALL serve upon the United States Attorney's office a copy of every further pleading or other document submitted for consideration by the Court. SEE FULL WRITTEN ORDER. (JRK, ilcd)
October 14, 2020 Filing fee: $ 5.00, receipt number 14626038743 (AEM, ilcd)
October 2, 2020 Set Deadlines: Petitioner's Deficiencies to be remedied by 10/30/2020. (VH, ilcd)
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Judge Joe Billy McDade on 10/2/2020. The Court notes Plaintiff has neither paid the applicable filing fee nor submitted a motion to proceed in forma pauperis. If Plaintiff does not either pay the filing fee or file a motion to proceed in forma pauperis within twenty-eight (28) days of the date of this Order, this case will be dismissed for failure to prosecute. (KRL, ilcd)
October 1, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus 2241, filed by James A Faulkner.(AEM, ilcd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Faulkner v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Represented By: W. Scott Simpson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: James A Faulkner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?