Estate of Sarah R. Seybold v. Tazewell County et al
Plaintiff: Estate of Sarah R. Seybold
Defendant: Marissa Hutton, Jeffrey Lower, Kara Hoffman, Wellpath, Kara Toel, H.I.G. Capital, LLC, Bryce Colvin, Hannah Williamson and Tazewell County
Case Number: 1:2020cv01386
Filed: November 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Jonathan E Hawley
Referring Judge: James E Shadid
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 6, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Terence J Corrigan on behalf of Bryce Colvin, Kara Hoffman, Marissa Hutton, Jeffrey Lower, Tazewell County, Kara Toel (Corrigan, Terence)
December 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Bhairav Radia on behalf of Bryce Colvin, Kara Hoffman, Marissa Hutton, Jeffrey Lower, Tazewell County, Kara Toel (Radia, Bhairav)
December 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Joel David Bertocchi on behalf of H.I.G. Capital, LLC (Bertocchi, Joel)
November 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Estate of Sarah R. Seybold. H.I.G. Capital, LLC waiver sent on 11/6/2020, answer due 1/5/2021. (Meyer, Louis)
November 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Jeffrey Alan Green on behalf of Estate of Sarah R. Seybold (Green, Jeffrey)
November 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF SERVICE and Notice of Lawsuit sent to Kara Toel on 11/06/2020. (Attachments: #1 Waiver of The Service of Summons)(Meyer, Louis)
November 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF SERVICE and Notice of Lawsuit sent to Aaron Hoffman on 11/06/2020. (Attachments: #1 Waiver of The Service of Summons)(Meyer, Louis)
November 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF SERVICE and Notice of Lawsuit sent to Bryce Colvin on 11/06/2020. (Attachments: #1 Waiver of The Service of Summons)(Meyer, Louis)
November 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF SERVICE and Notice of Lawsuit sent to Marissa Hutton on 11/06/2020. (Attachments: #1 Waiver of The Service of Summons)(Meyer, Louis)
November 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF SERVICE and Notice of Lawsuit sent to Hannah Williamson on 11/06/2020. (Attachments: #1 Waiver of The Service of Summons)(Meyer, Louis)
November 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF SERVICE and Notice of Lawsuit sent to H.I.G. Capital, LLC on 11/06/2020. (Attachments: #1 Waiver of The Service of Summons)(Meyer, Louis)
November 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF SERVICE and Notice of Lawsuit sent to Wellpath on 11/06/2020. (Attachments: #1 Waiver of The Service of Summons)(Meyer, Louis)
November 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF SERVICE and Notice of Lawsuit sent to Sheriff Jeffrey Lower on 11/06/2020. (Attachments: #1 Waiver of The Service of Summons)(Meyer, Louis)
November 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF SERVICE and Notice of Lawsuit sent to Tazewell County on 11/06/2020. (Attachments: #1 Waiver of The Service of Summons)(Meyer, Louis)
November 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Louis J Meyer on behalf of Estate of Sarah R. Seybold (Meyer, Louis)
November 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0753-3516601.), filed by Estate of Sarah R. Seybold. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet civil cover sheet)(Meyer, Louis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Estate of Sarah R. Seybold v. Tazewell County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marissa Hutton
Represented By: Terence J Corrigan
Represented By: Bhairav Radia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Lower
Represented By: Terence J Corrigan
Represented By: Bhairav Radia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kara Hoffman
Represented By: Terence J Corrigan
Represented By: Bhairav Radia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wellpath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kara Toel
Represented By: Terence J Corrigan
Represented By: Bhairav Radia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H.I.G. Capital, LLC
Represented By: Joel David Bertocchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bryce Colvin
Represented By: Terence J Corrigan
Represented By: Bhairav Radia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hannah Williamson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tazewell County
Represented By: Terence J Corrigan
Represented By: Bhairav Radia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estate of Sarah R. Seybold
Represented By: Louis J Meyer
Represented By: Jeffrey Alan Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?