Stone v. Johnson et al
Plaintiff: Michael Stone
Defendant: Brad Johnson, . Fyffe, . Walters and Justin Hammers
Case Number: 1:2020cv01403
Filed: November 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Colin Stirling Bruce
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison Conditions
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 14, 2020 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Michael Stone.. Fyffe waiver sent on 12/8/2020, answer due 2/8/2021; Brad Johnson waiver sent on 12/8/2020, answer due 2/8/2021;. Walters waiver sent on 12/8/2020, answer due 2/8/2021. (DS, ilcd)
December 8, 2020 Filing 9 REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF SERVICE and Notice of Lawsuit sent to Fyffe, Justin Hammers, Brad Johnson, Walters on 12/8/2020. (Attachments: #1 Waiver Johnson, #2 Waiver Hammers, #3 Waiver Fyffe)(KE, ilcd)
December 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 HIPAA QUALIFIED PROTECTIVE ORDER entered by Judge Colin Stirling Bruce on 12/8/2020. See written order. (KE, ilcd)
December 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MERIT REVIEW ORDER entered by Judge Colin Stirling Bruce on 12/8/2020. Pursuant to its merit review of the Complaint under 28 U.S.C. Sec 1915A, the Court finds that Plaintiff's Complaint states a First Amendment retaliation claim against Defendants. Any additional claim(s) shall not be included in the case, except at the Court's discretion on motion by a party for good cause shown or pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 15. The Clerk is directed to enter the standard qualified protective order pursuant to the Health Insurance Portability and Accountability Act. The Clerk is directed to attempt service on Defendants pursuant to the Court's standard procedures. Plaintiff's motion for access to the law library #6 is DENIED. Plaintiff must timely pay the initial, partial filing fee of $59.67 that the Court imposed in this case. If Plaintiff fails to pay this fee timely, the Court will dismiss this case. See written order. (KE, ilcd)
December 4, 2020 Prisoner Initial Partial Filing Fee received 12/4/20, in the amount of $ 59.67; receipt number 14626039178 (FDS, ilcd)
November 24, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Order for Access to Law Library by Plaintiff Michael Stone. Responses due by 12/8/2020. (DS, ilcd)
November 18, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Judge Colin Stirling Bruce on 11/18/2020. Plaintiff's motion to request counsel #5 is DENIED. The Court generally will not consider recruiting counsel for a pro se plaintiff until the Court determines that he possess a claim upon which relief can be granted after the Court conducts a merit review of the complaint. Plaintiff may renew his motion if his claim survives a merit review that the Court will conduct in the near future. (KE, ilcd)
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #3 Petition to Proceed In Forma Pauperis entered by Judge Colin Stirling Bruce on 11/17/2020. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1915(b)(1), Plaintiff is assessed an initial partial filing fee of $59.67. The agency having custody of Plaintiff is directed to forward the initial partial filing fee from Plaintiff`s account to the Clerk of Court within 30 days of this order. After payment of the initial partial filing fee (or immediately if no funds are available for that payment) the agency having custody of Plaintiff shall make monthly payments of 20 percent of the preceding month`s income credited to Plaintiff`s account to the Clerk of Court. Income includes all deposits from any source, including gifts. The agency having custody of the plaintiff shall forward these payments each time Plaintiff`s account exceeds $10, until the filing fee of $350 is paid in full. Plaintiff is ultimately responsible for ensuring that the initial partial filing fee and required monthly payments are made. Failure to do so may result in dismissal of this case. The Clerk is directed to mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff`s place of confinement, to the attention of the Trust Fund Office, and to Plaintiff. Prisoner Prepayment due by 12/17/2020. (KE, ilcd)
November 17, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Request Counsel by Plaintiff Michael Stone. Responses due by 12/1/2020 (KE, ilcd)
November 17, 2020 Filing 4 +++ PRISONER TRUST FUND LEDGER by Michael Stone. (KE, ilcd)
November 17, 2020 Filing 3 PETITION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, filed by Michael Stone.(KE, ilcd)
November 17, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF CASE OPENING. Please be advised that your case has been assigned to Judge Colin Stirling Bruce. Effective immediately, all documents should be mailed or scanned to the Urbana Division, 201 S Vine Street, Urbana, IL 61802.Merit Review Deadline set for 12/7/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice Regarding Privacy Issues)(KE, ilcd)
November 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Michael Stone. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits)(KE, ilcd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stone v. Johnson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brad Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: . Fyffe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: . Walters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justin Hammers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Stone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?