Griffin v. Poynter et al
Plaintiff: Sheila Griffin
Defendant: Johanna O'Brien, Mark Ohrwall, Richard Rountree, Patricia Shannon, Ashley Deckert, Stefanie Moreau, Cynthia Clay, Mark Delashmit, Mary Ann Poynter, Cynthia Baker and Daniel Norris
Case Number: 1:2020cv01427
Filed: December 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Jonathan E Hawley
Referring Judge: James E Shadid
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #7 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Miranda L Soucie terminated as counsel in this case. Entered by Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley on 1/10/21. (WG, ilcd)
January 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney M Soucie Mot2Withdraw.Rountree by Plaintiff Sheila Griffin. Responses due by 1/22/2021 (Soucie, Miranda)
January 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF INTEREST pursuant to Local Rule 11.3 by Sheila Griffin. (Murphy, Julie)
January 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF INTEREST pursuant to Local Rule 11.3 by Sheila Griffin. (Murphy, Julie)
January 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF INTEREST pursuant to Local Rule 11.3 by Sheila Griffin. (Murphy, Julie)
January 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 AMENDED COMPLAINT Sheila Griffin, as Independent Administrator of the Estate of R.R., a minor, now deceased, against All Defendants, filed by Sheila Griffin.(Murphy, Julie)
December 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Cynthia Clay, Ashley Deckert, Mark Delashmit, Stefanie Moreau, Daniel Norris, Johanna O'Brien, Mark Ohrwall, Mary Ann Poynter, Richard Rountree, Patricia Shannon. (Summonses returned to attorneys for service). (TK, ilcd)
December 11, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER: The Plaintiff's Complaint #1 contains a minor's full name. The Clerk is therefore directed to SEAL the Complaint #1 , and the Plaintiff is directed to file a redacted copy of the Complaint which complies with Fed. R. Civ. P. 5.2(a). Entered by Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley on 12/11/2020. (KZ, ilcd)
December 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT Complaint.SGriffin against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0753-3542781.), filed by Sheila Griffin. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet CivCoverSheet.SGriffin, #2 Summons.Deckert, #3 Summons.Delashmit, #4 Summons.Moreau, #5 Summons.Norris, #6 Summons.O'Brien, #7 Summons.Ohrwall, #8 Summons.Poynter, #9 Summons.Rountree, #10 Summons.Shannon, #11 Summons.Clay(Baker))(Soucie, Miranda)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Griffin v. Poynter et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johanna O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Ohrwall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Rountree
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia Shannon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ashley Deckert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stefanie Moreau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cynthia Clay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Delashmit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Ann Poynter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cynthia Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Norris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheila Griffin
Represented By: Miranda L Soucie
Represented By: Andrew J Thut
Represented By: Christopher O'Neil
Represented By: Steven M Levin
Represented By: Benjamin Crump
Represented By: Julie Ann Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?