Martin v. Petersen Health Operations, LLC
Plaintiff: Anita Martin
Defendant: Petersen Health Operations, LLC an Illinois Limited Liability Corporation doing business as Bloomington Rehabilitation & Health Care Center
Case Number: 1:2020cv01449
Filed: December 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Jonathan E Hawley
Referring Judge: Joe Billy McDade
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 247
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Exhibit by Anita Martin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(Shore, Megan)
February 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MEMORANDUM by Anita Martin. (Shore, Megan)
February 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MOTION to Remand by Plaintiff Anita Martin. Responses due by 3/10/2021 (Shore, Megan)
February 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MOTION for Leave to File a Sur-Reply by Plaintiff Anita Martin. Responses due by 3/8/2021 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Shore, Megan)
February 22, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #20 Motion for Leave to File entered by Judge Joe Billy McDade on 2/22/2021. In light of the unopposed nature of the Motion and the circumstances stated therein, Plaintiff's Motion is granted. Plaintiff may file a Reply in support of her Motion to Remand, not to exceed 15 pages, on or before 3/8/2021. Plaintiff shall also re-file copies of her Amended Motion to Remand and Memorandum with the corrected name of the Court in the caption at her earliest convenience. (KRL)
February 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #16 MOTION to Remand filed by Defendant Petersen Health Operations, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Wetzel, Joseph)
February 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 CERTIFICATE of Compliance. (Shore, Megan)
February 9, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER: Due to the pending #16 MOTION to Remand and #12 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM, the Rule 16 conference set on 3/5/2021 is VACATED. Rule 16 conference will be reset if necessary after the disposition of the motions. Entered by Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley on 2/9/21. (WG, ilcd)
February 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MEMORANDUM by Anita Martin. (Shore, Megan)
February 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MOTION to Remand by Plaintiff Anita Martin. Responses due by 2/22/2021 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E)(Shore, Megan)
February 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Plaintiff Anita Martin. Responses due by 2/17/2021 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Shore, Megan)
February 3, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting in part and denying in part #15 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages entered by Judge Joe Billy McDade on 2/3/2021. In light of the unopposed nature of the motion and the circumstances stated therein, the Court grants the Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages insofar as Defendant may file a memorandum in support of its Motion to Dismiss not to exceed 20 pages, and Plaintiff may file a memorandum in support of its Motion to Remand not to exceed 32 pages. No expansion of the limit set by Local Rule 7.1(B)(4) is necessary for Defendant's Response to the Motion to Remand, which the parties agree is not to exceed 15 pages. The Court defers ruling on Plaintiff's proposed Reply not to exceed 15 pages; after Defendant files its Response to the Motion to Remand, the Court will entertain a separate Motion for Leave to File a Reply pursuant to Local Rule 7.1(B)(3) should Plaintiff still seek to file one. (KRL, ilcd)
February 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MOTION to Continue Defendant's Motion to Dismiss by Plaintiff Anita Martin. Responses due by 2/16/2021 (Attachments: #1 Errata Exhibit 1, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Shore, Megan)
February 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MEMORANDUM In Support re #12 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Petersen Health Operations, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M)(Wetzel, Joseph)
February 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Petersen Health Operations, LLC. Responses due by 2/16/2021 (Wetzel, Joseph)
February 2, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER finding as moot #11 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages; granting #14 Motion to Continue entered by Judge Joe Billy McDade on 2/2/2021. As the memorandum filed by Defendant (doc. 13) is in compliance with the word limit set by Local Rule 7.1(b)(4)(b), the Court finds Defendant's Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages moot. If this submission excludes information Defendant intended to include, Defendant may file a new motion specifying the length of the full document Defendant seeks to file. Additionally, the joint Motion to Continue (doc. 14) is granted; Plaintiff may file a response to Defendant's Rule 12 Motion (doc. 12) within 30 days of the Court's Order resolving a motion to remand. (KRL, ilcd)
January 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Defendant Petersen Health Operations, LLC. Responses due by 2/16/2021 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Wetzel, Joseph)
January 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Megan M Shore on behalf of Anita Martin (Shore, Megan)
January 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Plaintiff's Motion for remand shall be filed by 2/8/21. Entered by Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley on 1/20/21. (WG, ilcd)
January 20, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley on 1/20/2021. : It appears Plaintiff's counsel inadvertently failed to sign her Appearance of Counsel #7 . Plaintiff's counsel is directed to file a signed copy of that form.(JS, ilcd)
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Motion to Remand by Plaintiff Anita Martin. Responses due by 2/2/2021 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Shore, Megan)
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Megan M Shore on behalf of Anita Martin (Shore, Megan)
January 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER: This case is set for a Rule 16 scheduling conference before Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley on 3/5/2021 at 10:00 AM via telephone. Counsel are to phone into conference by calling 571-353-2300, then enter 287753270#. Please announce your name each time prior to speaking unless the judge asks a question directly to you so that the speaker may be identified by all. A discovery plan pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f)(3) shall be filed on or before 3/2/2021. The parties may, but are not required to, follow the format of the sample discovery plan set forth as Attachment A to the standing order attached to this text order. The Discovery Plan event may be found in the CM/ECF system within the other Documents category. All counsel must read and be familiar with the standing order attached to this text order prior to their Rule 26(f) planning meeting. Entered by Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley on 1/8/2021. (WG, ilcd)
January 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Petersen Health Operations, LLC answer due 2/2/2021. Entered by Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley on 1/2/21. (WG, ilcd)
December 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, Attachment #1, Exhibit A - Complaint by Defendant Petersen Health Operations, LLC. Responses due by 1/13/2021 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wetzel, Joseph)
December 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF INTEREST pursuant to Local Rule 11.3 by Petersen Health Operations, LLC, an Illinois Corporation, d/b/a Bloomington Rehabilitation & Health Care Center. (Wetzel, Joseph)
December 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Joseph R Wetzel on behalf of Petersen Health Operations, LLC, an Illinois Corporation, d/b/a Bloomington Rehabilitation & Health Care Center (Wetzel, Joseph)
December 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0753-3554586), filed by Petersen Health Operations, LLC, an Illinois Corporation, d/b/a Bloomington Rehabilitation & Health Care Center. (Attachments: #1 State Court Complaint, #2 State Court Return of Service #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(Wetzel, Joseph) Modified on 12/29/2020 (JS, ilcd).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martin v. Petersen Health Operations, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Petersen Health Operations, LLC an Illinois Limited Liability Corporation doing business as Bloomington Rehabilitation & Health Care Center
Represented By: Joseph R Wetzel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anita Martin
Represented By: Megan M Shore-Toca
Represented By: Megan M Shore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?