McClure, Administrator of the Estate of Estate of Samuel Thomas Cowdery, deceased, v. Harbor Freights Tools USA, Inc.
Plaintiff: Linda McClure, Administrator of the Estate of Estate of Samuel Thomas Cowdery, deceased,
Defendant: Harbor Freights Tools USA, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv01112
Filed: April 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Jonathan E Hawley
Referring Judge: Joe Billy McDade
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446 pl
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 7, 2021 Filing 9 DISCOVERY PLAN - PROPOSED/Report of Rule 26(f)Planning Meeting by Linda McClure, Administrator of the Estate of Estate of Samuel Thomas Cowdery, deceased,. (Kelly, Timothy)
May 25, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Clinton E Cameron on behalf of Harbor Freights Tools USA, Inc. (Cameron, Clinton)
May 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER: This case is set for a Rule 16 scheduling conference before Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley on 6/11/21 at 9:30 AM via telephone. Counsel are to phone into conference by calling 571-353-2300, then enter 287753270#. Please announce your name each time prior to speaking unless the judge asks a question directly to you so that the speaker may be identified by all. A discovery plan pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f)(3) shall be filed on or before 6/8/21. The parties may, but are not required to, follow the format of the sample discovery plan set forth as Attachment A to the standing order attached to this text order. The Discovery Plan event may be found in the CM/ECF system within the other Documents category. All counsel must read and be familiar with the standing order attached to this text order prior to their Rule 26(f) planning meeting. Entered by Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley on 5/10/2021. (WG, ilcd)
April 29, 2021 Filing 6 Subpoena to Testify at a Deposition in a Civil Trial filed by Linda McClure, Administrator of the Estate of Estate of Samuel Thomas Cowdery, deceased, as to Timothy W. Kelly.. (Tintera, Josephine)
April 29, 2021 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF INTEREST pursuant to Local Rule 11.3 by Linda McClure, Administrator of the Estate of Estate of Samuel Thomas Cowdery, deceased,. (Tintera, Josephine)
April 16, 2021 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES by Harbor Freights Tools USA, Inc..(Swallow, William)
April 16, 2021 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF INTEREST pursuant to Local Rule 11.3 by Harbor Freights Tools USA, Inc.. (Swallow, William)
April 9, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by William Chandler Swallow on behalf of Harbor Freights Tools USA, Inc. (Swallow, William)
April 9, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from State of Illinois In the Circuit Court of the Eleventh Judical Circuit, McLean County, case number 2021L00031 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0753-3632887), filed by Harbor Freights Tools USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Swallow, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McClure, Administrator of the Estate of Estate of Samuel Thomas Cowdery, deceased, v. Harbor Freights Tools USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harbor Freights Tools USA, Inc.
Represented By: William Chandler Swallow
Represented By: Clinton E Cameron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda McClure, Administrator of the Estate of Estate of Samuel Thomas Cowdery, deceased,
Represented By: Timothy W Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?