Henderson v. Jackson
Plaintiff: Johnnie Henderson
Defendant: Leonta Jackson
Case Number: 1:2021cv01120
Filed: April 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: James E Shadid
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison Conditions
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 11, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 11, 2021 Filing 9 Remark: Court of Appeals notified Clerk's Office CDIL that the Short Record - Notice of Appeal is returned unfiled because Johnnie L. Henderson is a restricted filer in their circuit and he has yet to comply with their filing bar, pursuant to court's 12/20/2018 order in appeal no 18-2413 (where all outstanding fees need to be paid). (Order attached). (KB)
May 11, 2021 Filing 8 Short Record of Appeal Sent to US Court of Appeals regarding #7 Notice of Appeal. (KB)
April 30, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to Order Dismissing Case by Johnnie Henderson. (AEM)
April 23, 2021 Filing 6 JUDGMENT entered in a civil case (SAG)
April 23, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Judge James E. Shadid on 4/23/2021. The pro se Plaintiff has filed a complaint, a motion to proceed in forma pauperis (IFP), a motion for appointment of counsel, and a motion for emergency injunctive relief #1 , #3 , #4 , #5 . Plaintiff alleges "prison officials are violating plaintiff's first and fourteenth amendment rights to political associations." (Comp, p. 5). Plaintiff further claims his family members are in danger and they have been "cloned by the thousands." (Comp., p. 1). Plaintiff also cites vague fears for his own safety. On December 20, 2018, the Seventh Circuit Court of Appeals barred Plaintiff from filing any papers in any federal court in this Circuit, except for habeas and criminal cases, until Plaintiff has paid all outstanding fees and sanctions. Henderson v. Varga, Appeal No. 18-2413 (7th Cir.). A recent motion to rescind the filing bar was denied. See January 27, 2021, Order. Therefore, this case is closed and all pending motions are moot. The Court notes even if the filing ban were lifted, Plaintiff has accumulated three strikes and could not proceed IFP unless he were in imminent danger. See Henderson v. Varga, Case No. 18-1216, June 21, 2018, Text Order. Plaintiff's complaint does not meet this standard.(SAG)
April 22, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE OF CASE OPENING. Please be advised that your case has been assigned to Judge James Shadid. Effective immediately, all documents should be mailed or scanned to the Peoria Division, 100 NE Monroe Street, Peoria, IL 61602. Merit Review Deadline set for 5/12/2021. (Attachments: #1 Notice Regarding Privacy Issues)(SAG)
April 20, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Plaintiff Johnnie Henderson. Responses due by 5/4/2021 (SAG)
April 20, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION to Request Counsel by Plaintiff Johnnie Henderson. Responses due by 5/4/2021 (SAG)
April 20, 2021 Filing 3 PETITION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, filed by Johnnie Henderson.(SAG)
April 20, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Leonta Jackson, filed by Johnnie Henderson.(SAG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Henderson v. Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnnie Henderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leonta Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?