Farwell v. Google, LLC
Plaintiff: Clinton Farwell
Defendant: Google, LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv01122
Filed: April 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Sara Darrow
Referring Judge: Jonathan E Hawley
2 Judge: Michael M Mihm
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 16, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER: Court vacates the Rule 16 conference set on 6/25/21 pending the disposition of the #11 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Google, LLC. Hearing will be reset when necessary. Entered by Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley on 6/16/21. (WG)
June 11, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Response to Motion to Dismiss now due by 7/1/2021 (ANW)
June 10, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Chief Judge Sara Darrow on June 10, 2021. The parties' #13 Joint Motion to Extend Deadline to Respond to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED. Plaintiffs' response is now due on July 1, 2021. (SV)
June 8, 2021 Filing 13 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #11 MOTION to Dismiss by Plaintiff Clinton Farwell. (Fraietta, Philip)
May 27, 2021 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #11 MOTION to Dismiss (Declaration of Samuel Wilson) filed by Defendant Google, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit S, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Wilson, Samuel)
May 27, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant Google, LLC. Responses due by 6/10/2021 (Wilson, Bobbie)
May 27, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Bobbie J. Wilson on behalf of Google, LLC (Wilson, Bobbie)
May 27, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Sunita Bali on behalf of All Defendants (Bali, Sunita)
May 27, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Samuel Wilson on behalf of Google, LLC (Wilson, Samuel)
May 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER: This case is set for a Rule 16 scheduling conference before Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley on 6/25/21 at 10:00 AM via telephone. Counsel are to phone into conference by calling 571-353-2300, then enter 287753270#. Please announce your name each time prior to speaking unless the judge asks a question directly to you so that the speaker may be identified by all. A discovery plan pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f)(3) shall be filed on or before 6/22/2021. The parties may, but are not required to, follow the format of the sample discovery plan set forth as Attachment A to the standing order attached to this text order. The Discovery Plan event may be found in the CM/ECF system within the other Documents category. All counsel must read and be familiar with the standing order attached to this text order prior to their Rule 26(f) planning meeting. Entered by Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley on 5/24/2021. (WG)
April 22, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER: The Plaintiff filed this action in the Circuit Court of McDonough County, Illinois. The Defendant filed a Notice of Removal #1 in the Central District of Illinois, Peoria Division. It appears Defendant's filing in the Peoria Division was inadvertent, as the caption of the Notice of Removal identifies the Rock Island Division of this Court, and the Defendant explains in the body of the Notice of Removal why transfer to the Central District of Illinois, Rock Island Division is proper. The Clerk is therefore directed to TRANSFER this case to the Rock Island Division of the U.S. District Court for the Central District of Illinois. Entered by Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley on 4/22/2021. (KZ)
April 22, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #6 agreed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Dft Google, LLC answer due 5/27/2021. Entered by Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley on 4/22/21. (WG)
April 21, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Respond to Complaint (Agreed) by Defendant Google, LLC. Responses due by 5/27/2021 (Menaldo, Nicola)
April 21, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Nicola C Menaldo on behalf of Google, LLC (Menaldo, Nicola)
April 20, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE Civil Cover Sheet re #1 Notice of Removal (Stetsko, Kathleen)
April 20, 2021 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF INTEREST pursuant to Local Rule 11.3 by Google, LLC. (Stetsko, Kathleen)
April 20, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Kathleen A Stetsko on behalf of Google, LLC (Stetsko, Kathleen)
April 20, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from McDonough County Circuit Court, case number 20 l 00017 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0753-3641201), filed by Google, LLC.(Stetsko, Kathleen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Farwell v. Google, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clinton Farwell
Represented By: Frank S Hedin
Represented By: Philip L Fraietta
Represented By: Scott A Bursor
Represented By: Joshua D Arisohn
Represented By: Andrew John Stuckart
Represented By: Joseph I Marchese
Represented By: David W Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google, LLC
Represented By: Kathleen A Stetsko
Represented By: Sunita Bali
Represented By: Nicola C Menaldo
Represented By: Samuel Wilson
Represented By: Bobbie J. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?