Blair v. Depuy Orthopaedics, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Krystal Blair
Defendant: Depuy Orthopaedics, Inc., DEPUY SYNTHES SALES, INC. and DEPUY SYNTHES PRODUCTS, INC.
Case Number: 1:2021cv01133
Filed: April 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Jonathan E Hawley
Referring Judge: Joe Billy McDade
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2021 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE of Service/Counsel of Plaintiffs Initial Disclosures by Randall Seth Crompton on behalf of Krystal Blair (Crompton, Randall)
June 17, 2021 Filing 13 TEXT ORDER by U.S. Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley: The Court adopts the Discovery Plan #12 . Discovery due by 12/21/2022. Dispositive Motions due by 1/27/2023. Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/26/2023 at 11:00 AM and Jury Trial set for 6/5/2023 at 9:00 AM, BOTH in Courtroom D before District Judge McDade. Court notes the discovery plan states the trial will require 10-15 court days. Rule 16 conference set 6/25/21 at 11:00 AM is VACATED. Court stresses the importance of adhering to the schedule and procedures for requests to extend the schedule. The parties are expected to review Judge Hawleys Standing Order that was revised on 12/6/2018. Parties are reminded of their option to consent to proceed before US Magistrate Judge. See attached form. Parties are reminded of option of Court sponsored mediation/Settlement Conference. Counsel/Parties are reminded of the importance of appearing for hearings scheduled via telephone. Failure to appear will result in in-person appearances for all further proceedings. Entered: 6/17/2021. (WG)
June 17, 2021 Filing 12 DISCOVERY PLAN - PROPOSED/Report of Rule 26(f)Planning Meeting by DEPUY SYNTHES PRODUCTS, INC., DEPUY SYNTHES SALES, INC., Depuy Orthopaedics, Inc.. (Essig, William)
June 14, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by David R Schmahmann on behalf of All Defendants (Schmahmann, David)
June 14, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by David L Ferrera on behalf of DEPUY SYNTHES PRODUCTS, INC., DEPUY SYNTHES SALES, INC., Depuy Orthopaedics, Inc. (Ferrera, David)
May 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER: This case is set for a Rule 16 scheduling conference before Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley on 6/25/2021 at 11:00 AM via telephone. Counsel are to phone into conference by calling 571-353-2300, then enter 287753270#. Please announce your name each time prior to speaking unless the judge asks a question directly to you so that the speaker may be identified by all. A discovery plan pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f)(3) shall be filed on or before 6/22/2021. The parties may, but are not required to, follow the format of the sample discovery plan set forth as Attachment A to the standing order attached to this text order. The Discovery Plan event may be found in the CM/ECF system within the other Documents category. All counsel must read and be familiar with the standing order attached to this text order prior to their Rule 26(f) planning meeting. Entered by Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley on 5/26/2021. (WG)
May 26, 2021 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF INTEREST pursuant to Local Rule 11.3 by DEPUY SYNTHES PRODUCTS, INC., DEPUY SYNTHES SALES, INC., Depuy Orthopaedics, Inc.. (Essig, William)
May 26, 2021 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES by DEPUY SYNTHES PRODUCTS, INC., DEPUY SYNTHES SALES, INC., Depuy Orthopaedics, Inc..(Essig, William)
May 26, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by William V Essig on behalf of DEPUY SYNTHES PRODUCTS, INC., DEPUY SYNTHES SALES, INC., Depuy Orthopaedics, Inc. (Essig, William)
May 25, 2021 Filing 5 Return of Service Executed by Krystal Blair as to Depuy Orthopaedics, Inc. 5/21/2021. (Crompton, Randall)
May 11, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Krystal Blair. DEPUY SYNTHES SALES, INC. served on 5/5/2021, answer due 5/26/2021. (Holland, Eric)
May 11, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Krystal Blair. DEPUY SYNTHES PRODUCTS, INC. served on 5/6/2021, answer due 5/27/2021. (Holland, Eric)
April 28, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to DEPUY SYNTHES PRODUCTS, INC., DEPUY SYNTHES SALES, INC., Depuy Orthopaedics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(TK)
April 28, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against DEPUY SYNTHES PRODUCTS, INC., DEPUY SYNTHES SALES, INC., Depuy Orthopaedics, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0753-3647106.), filed by Krystal L Blair. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Summons on DePuy Orthopaedics Inc, #3 Exhibit Summons on DePuy Synthes Products Inc, #4 Exhibit Summons on DePuy Synthes Sales Inc)(Crompton, Randall)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blair v. Depuy Orthopaedics, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Krystal Blair
Represented By: Kevin Kauffman
Represented By: David Conrad DeGreeff
Represented By: Randall Seth Crompton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Depuy Orthopaedics, Inc.
Represented By: William V Essig
Represented By: David R Schmahmann
Represented By: David L Ferrera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEPUY SYNTHES SALES, INC.
Represented By: William V Essig
Represented By: David R Schmahmann
Represented By: David L Ferrera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEPUY SYNTHES PRODUCTS, INC.
Represented By: William V Essig
Represented By: David R Schmahmann
Represented By: David L Ferrera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?