Anderson v. Butts et al
Plaintiff: Juan V Anderson
Defendant: Officer Tim Henson, Randy Yednak, Officer Alex Butts and Detective Gary Beier
Case Number: 1:2021cv01161
Filed: May 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Jonathan E Hawley
Referring Judge: Michael M Mihm
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 24, 2021 Filing 17 Case transferred in from District of Minnesota; Case Number 0:21-cv-00937. .
May 17, 2021 Filing 16 LETTER from Clerk's Office to Juan V. Anderson re #15 Letter to Court. (CLK)
May 14, 2021 Filing 15 LETTER TO THE COURT from Juan V Anderson. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(CLK)
May 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER denying #13 Motion for Relief from Judgment. Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 5/14/2021. (SMD)
May 12, 2021 NOTICE OF DOCKETING CORRECTION: The incorrect event was used for document no. #12 and is Refiled correctly as a Motion for Relief from Judgment, see Document no. #13 . (KNK)
May 11, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION for Relief from Judgment filed by Juan V Anderson. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(KNK)
May 11, 2021 Filing 12 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR, WILL BE REFILED CORRECTLY - NOTICE OF APPEAL TO 8TH CIRCUIT as to #9 Order on Application on Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs, #10 Judgment by Juan V Anderson. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(KNK) Modified text on 5/12/2021 (KNK). Modified text on 5/12/2021 (KNK).
May 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT OF RELATED CASES that 21cv1076 (NEB/DTS), 21cv1126 (PAM/BRT), 21cv1127 (MJD/TNL), 21cv1128 (DFW/HB), 21cv1150 (PJS/KMM), 21cv1151 (WMW/HB), and 21cv1152 (DSD/TNL) have been reassigned to Judge Susan Richard Nelson and Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz.Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson, Judge Nancy E. Brasel, Judge Paul A. Magnuson, Judge Michael J. Davis, Judge Donovan W. Frank, Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright, Judge David S. Doty on 5/6/2021. Signed by Judge Patrick J. Schiltz on 5/10/2021.(MMG)
May 7, 2021 Filing 10 JUDGMENT (Attachments: #1 Civil Notice - appeal)(MTP)
May 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER denying #2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs; transferring this matter to the United States District Court for the Central District of Illinois. (Written Opinion) Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 5/6/2021. (SMD)
April 30, 2021 Filing 8 Clerk's Notice of APPLICATION FOR PRO SE LITIGANT TO FILE ELECTRONICALLY. Juan V Anderson is GRANTED e-filing privileges in this case. Pursuant to F.R.Cv.P. Rule 5 and 7(d), Juan V Anderson has consented to electronic service and has agreed to waive service by other means for all subsequent filings in this case, except when electronic service is not allowed under the rules. (JGK)
April 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT OF RELATED CASES that 21-cv-1022 DWF/BRT and 21-cv-1023 NEB/BRT have been reassigned to Judge Susan Richard Nelson and Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 4/22/2021 and Judge Donovan W. Frank and Judge Nancy S. Brasel on 4/23/2021.(CLK)
April 22, 2021 (Text-Only) Mail Returned as Undeliverable #3 . Mail sent to Juan V. Anderson at 5123 W. 98th, Minneapolis, MN 55437 but was returned marked: Commercial Mail Receiving Agency - No authorization to receive mail for this addressee. Mail re-sent to plaintiff at 2354 Chevy Chase Lane, Decatur, GA 30032. (CLK) Document QC'd on 5/5/2021 (MTP).
April 19, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Gary Beier, Alex Butts, Tim Henson, Randy Yednak. cc: Juan V. Anderson w/ Information sheet. (JGK)
April 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT OF RELATED CASES that 21-cv-971 NEB/HB and 21-cv-972 ECT/KMM are reassigned to Judge Susan Richard Nelson and Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson, Judge Nancy E. Brasel, and Judge Eric C. Tostrud on 4/15/2021.(CLK)
April 13, 2021 Filing 4 RECEIPT number AMNDC-0000091 in the amount of $402.00 issued to Juan V. Anderson. (JGK)
April 12, 2021 (Text-Only) Mail Returned as Undeliverable #1 , #2 . Mail sent to Juan V. Anderson (at 5123 W. 98th; Minneapolis, MN 55437) was stamped "Return to Sender"; "Return to Sender, Commercial Mail Receiving Agency, No authorization to receive mail for this addressee". Mail was not re-sent. (lmb) Document QC'd on 4/27/2021 (MTP).
April 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Response due by 5/6/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 4/8/2021. (TJB)
April 6, 2021 Filing 2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Juan V. Anderson. (JGK) DOCUMENT QC'd by on 5/20/21. (kt)
April 6, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Gary Beier, Alex Butts, Tim Henson, Randy Yednak filed by Juan V. Anderson. No summons requested. Case assigned to Judge Susan Richard Nelson per 3rd/4th Civil Rights list, referred to Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Envelope) (JGK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anderson v. Butts et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Tim Henson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randy Yednak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Alex Butts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Detective Gary Beier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan V Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?