ELM One Call Locators, Inc. et al v. Midcontinent Communications
Plaintiff: ELM One Call Locators, Inc. and One Call Locators, LTD.
Defendant: Midcontinent Communications
Case Number: 1:2021cv01176
Filed: June 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Jonathan E Hawley
Referring Judge: James E Shadid
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Midcontinent Communications. (AEM)
July 14, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Summons filed by ELM One Call Locators, Inc., One Call Locators, LTD. (Zabek, Samuel) Modified on 7/15/2021 (JS).
June 30, 2021 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by ELM One Call Locators, Inc..(Zabek, Samuel)
June 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER re subject matter jurisdiction. Entered by Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley on 6/22/2021. (KZ)
June 21, 2021 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTEREST pursuant to Local Rule 11.3 by ELM One Call Locators, Inc.. (Zabek, Samuel)
June 21, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Midcontinent Communications (Filing fee $402. Receipt #3693759), filed by ELM One Call Locators, Inc., One Call Locators, LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(JS)
June 21, 2021 Judge James E. Shadid and Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley added. (JS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ELM One Call Locators, Inc. et al v. Midcontinent Communications
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midcontinent Communications
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ELM One Call Locators, Inc.
Represented By: Samuel Benjamin Zabek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: One Call Locators, LTD.
Represented By: Samuel Benjamin Zabek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?