Huston v. Hearst Communications, Inc.
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Huston
Defendant: Hearst Communications, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv01196
Filed: July 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Jonathan E Hawley
Referring Judge: Michael M Mihm
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 15, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 15, 2022 Filing 23 NOTICE of Change of Address by James Dominick Larry (Larry, James)
March 28, 2022 Filing 22 NOTICE of Docketing Record on Appeal from USCA re #19 Notice of Appeal, filed by Elizabeth Huston. USCA Case Number 22-1489. (AH)
March 28, 2022 Filing 21 Short Record of Appeal Sent to US Court of Appeals re #19 Notice of Appeal. (AH)
March 25, 2022 Filing 20 DOCKETING STATEMENT by Elizabeth Huston re #19 Notice of Appeal, (Larry, James)
March 25, 2022 Filing 19 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #16 Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, Order,, by Elizabeth Huston. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number AILCDC-3898863. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Judgment, #2 Exhibit B - Order)(Larry, James)
February 24, 2022 Filing 18 JUDGMENT In a Civil Case. (AEM)
February 24, 2022 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER Entered by Judge Michael M. Mihm on 2/24/2022. On February 7, 2022, the Court granted Defendants Motion to Dismiss and offered Plaintiff the opportunity to file an Amended Complaint within 21 days. Plaintiff recently filed a notice #17 informing the Court that she does not intend to Amend her Complaint and instead seeks entry of a final judgment. Accordingly, it is appropriate to enter judgment before the expiration of Plaintiffs 21-day deadline. The Clerk is DIRECTED to prepare a final judgment for this case. (AEM)
February 15, 2022 Filing 17 NOTICE Regarding Non-Amendment of Complaint re #16 Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Larry, James)
February 7, 2022 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Amended Pleadings due by 2/28/2022. (AEM)
February 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MEMORANDUM ORDER and OPINION Entered by Judge Michael M. Mihm on 2/7/2022. Granting #9 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. (See Full Order) (AEM) Modified on 2/7/2022 (AEM).
November 29, 2021 Filing 15 DEFENDANT HEARST COMMUNICATIONS, INC.'S REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO DISMISS re #9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Defendant Hearst Communications, Inc.. (TK)
November 29, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #14 . Pending before the Court is Defendant's Motion for Leave to File a Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss. This Motion #14 is GRANTED for good cause shown. The Clerk is directed to file ECF No. 14-1 and the accompanying exhibits as Defendant's Reply regarding Defendant's Motion to Dismiss #9 . Entered by Judge Michael M. Mihm on 11/29/21. (TK)
November 23, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss by Defendant Hearst Communications, Inc.. Responses due by 12/7/2021 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Defendant's Reply Memorandum of Law)(Butler, Andrea)
October 28, 2021 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Plaintiff Elizabeth Huston. (Larry, James)
October 8, 2021 Reset Deadlines as to #9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . Responses due by 10/28/2021 (JS)
October 8, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER GRANTING #12 . Pending before the Court is the parties agreed motion to extend briefing deadlines for the pending motion to dismiss, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: (1) The stipulated motion is GRANTED; (2) Plaintiffs Opposition is due on or before October 28, 2021; (3) Defendants Reply, if any, is due on or before November 24, 2021. Entered by Judge Michael M. Mihm on 10/8/2021. (AEM)
October 7, 2021 Filing 12 STIPULATION re #9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Stipulated Motion to Extend Response and Reply Deadlines by Elizabeth Huston.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Larry, James)
September 24, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Kristen Hauser on behalf of Hearst Communications, Inc. (Hauser, Kristen)
September 24, 2021 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM in Support re #9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Defendant Hearst Communications, Inc.. (Butler, Andrea)
September 24, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Hearst Communications, Inc.. Responses due by 10/8/2021 (Butler, Andrea)
September 24, 2021 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF INTEREST pursuant to Local Rule 11.3 and Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Hearst Communications, Inc.. (Butler, Andrea)
September 24, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Andrea Butler on behalf of Hearst Communications, Inc. (Butler, Andrea)
August 9, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time to Respond by Defendant Hearst Communications, Inc.. Responses due by 8/23/2021 (Hirshman, Harold)
August 9, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Harold C Hirshman on behalf of Hearst Communications, Inc. (Hirshman, Harold)
August 9, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER GRANTING #6 Entered by Judge Michael M. Mihm on 8/9/2021. Pending before the Court is Defendants Motion for Extension of Time to Respond. Defendant explains that the deadline for responding to Plaintiffs Complaint is August 10, 2021, but requests an extension until September 24, 2021. Plaintiff does not oppose this motion. Accordingly, Defendants Motion #6 is granted and the deadline to respond is extended from August 10, 2021 until on or before September 24, 2021. (AEM)
July 28, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Elizabeth Huston. Hearst Communications, Inc. served on 7/20/2021, answer due 8/10/2021. (Larry, James)
July 15, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Hearst Communications, Inc.(Summons returned to attorney for service) (TK)
July 15, 2021 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTEREST pursuant to Local Rule 11.3 by Elizabeth Huston. (Larry, James)
July 15, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Class Action Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial against Hearst Communications, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AILCDC-3711755.), filed by Elizabeth Huston. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Proposed Summons)(Larry, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Huston v. Hearst Communications, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Huston
Represented By: James Dominick Larry
Represented By: Arun G Ravindran
Represented By: Frank S Hedin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hearst Communications, Inc.
Represented By: Harold C Hirshman
Represented By: Andrea Butler
Represented By: Kristen Hauser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?