Clinton v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Donna Clinton
Defendant: Comm'r of SSA Kilolo Kijakazi and Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: CSS-Social Security Administration
Case Number: 1:2021cv01219
Filed: August 6, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Sara Darrow
Referring Judge: Jonathan E Hawley
2 Judge: James E Shadid
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 416
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Lindsay Beyer Payne on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Payne, Lindsay)
August 23, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General and returned to attorney to effect service. (JRK)
August 9, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER: While the Plaintiff filed her Complaint #1 in the Peoria Division of this Court, the allegations of her Complaint include that she resides in Bureau County, Illinois. Bureau County is within the Rock Island Division of this Court. See CDIL-LR 40.1(C). Accordingly, the Clerk is directed to TRANSFER this case to the Rock Island Division of the U.S. District Court for the Central District of Illinois. Entered by Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley on 8/9/2021. (KZ)
August 6, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Robert E Fisher on behalf of Donna Clinton (Fisher, Robert)
August 6, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kilolo Kijakazi ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AILCDC-3729133.), filed by Donna Clinton. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons US DOJ, #3 Summons US AO, #4 Summons Office of Chief Regional Counsel)(Fisher, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clinton v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna Clinton
Represented By: Robert E Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Comm'r of SSA Kilolo Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Lindsay Beyer Payne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: CSS-Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?