Peel v. Entzel
Petitioner: Donald J. Peel
Respondent: Jusino and F Entzel
Case Number: 1:2021cv01235
Filed: August 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Sara Darrow
Referring Judge: James E Shadid
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 15, 2021 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Miscellaneous Deadline 10/29/2021 (VH)
September 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER Entered by Judge James E. Shadid on 9/14/2021. THEREFORE, IT IS ORDERED: The Court GRANTS Petitioners Motion for Status #28 . Because Petitioner indicates that he intends to seek to return this matter to the United States District Court for the Central District of California, the Court will STAY this matter for 45 days to allow Petitioner to pursue such relief. Petitioner shall inform the Court within 45 days if he wishes to extend the stay or the Court will lift the stay and rule on the Petition in due time. (See Full Order) (AEM)
September 14, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER: The Text Order entered on September 13, 2021 was entered in this case by mistake. The Clerk is DIRECTED to STRIKE the September 13, 2021 Text Order, transfer the case back to the Peoria Division of the United States District Court for the Central District of Illinois, and reassign Judge Shadid to this matter. Entered by Judge James E. Shadid on 9/14/2021. (AEM)
September 13, 2021 Filing 28 MOTION for Status by Petitioner Donald J. Peel. Responses due by 9/27/2021 (AEM)
September 13, 2021 Opinion or Order *STRICKEN PER 9/14 TEXT ORDER* TEXT ORDER: On August 31, 2021, this Court entered an Order directing Plaintiff to show cause as to why this case should not be transferred to the Rock Island Division where the Plaintiff resides. On September 10, 2021, Plaintiff filed a response stipulating that the Rock Island Division of the Central District of Illinois is the proper division for this case. (D. 6). The Clerk is directed to TRANSFER this case to the Rock Island Division of the United States District Court for the Central District of Illinois. See 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) (For the convenience of parties and witnesses, in the interest of justice, a district court may transfer any civil action to any other district or division where it might have been brought). Entered by Judge Michael M. Mihm on 9/13/21. (AEM) Modified on 9/14/2021 (AEM).
August 23, 2021 Filing 26 Case transferred in from District of California Central; Case Number 5:20-cv-00287. .
August 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE by Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani. The Court ORDERS that the case be TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Central District of Illinois. The Clerk of Court is directed to effectuate the transfer. (see document for further details). Original file, certified copy of the transfer order and docket sheet sent electronically. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (hr)
August 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE: PETITIONER'S EX PARTE MOTION FOR STATUS CHECK [ECF NO. 23] by Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani. The Court notifies Petitioner that the case is fully briefed, and no further action is required by any party at this moment. The Court is working expeditiously on all its cases, including Petitioners case, and all parties to this case will receive a notification when the Court has reached a decision. (dts)
August 6, 2021 Filing 23 MOTION for Status Check filed by Petitioner Donald J. Peel. (hr)
March 15, 2021 Filing 22 RESPONSE to Returned Mail #19 filed by Petitioner Donald J. Peel (hr)
February 19, 2021 Filing 21 NOTICE of Change of Address to P.O. Box 5000, Pekin, IL 61555. Filed by Petitioner Donald J. Peel. Note: This address is the same address in the Notice of Change of Address at Docket No. #18 and was previously updated. (hr)
February 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER RE: RETURNED MAIL #19 by Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani. Petitioner is reminded that he must respond to Court orders, even if Petitioner rejects delivery of such orders. Petitioner is cautioned that if he fails to abide by Court orders, the Court may dismiss this case for failure to follow Court orders and to diligently prosecute the case. Because the case is fully briefed and under submission, however, the Court takes no action at this time and, instead, will issue a decision on the Petition in due course. (see document for further details) (hr)
February 1, 2021 Filing 19 Mail Returned addressed to Donald J. Peel re Minutes (In Chambers) #16 (hr)
December 31, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Change of Address to Federal Correctional Institution, P.O. Box 5000, Pekin, IL 61555. Filed by Petitioner Donald J. Peel. (hr)
December 29, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Change of Address to Federal Transfer Center, PO Box 898801, Oklahoma City, OK 73189. Filed by Petitioner Donald J. Peel. (hr)
December 15, 2020 Filing 16 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani: finding as moot #15 MOTION for Order. The Court has read Petitioners Motion and finds it as MOOT. The Court is aware that Petitioner's case is fully briefed and is working expeditiously on all its cases including this case. No further action is required by any party at this moment. All parties to this case will receive a notification when the Court has reached a decision. (dc)
December 7, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION for Decision filed by Petitioner Donald J. Peel. (hr)
July 27, 2020 Filing 14 REPLY to Answer #11 filed by Petitioner Donald J. Peel (hr)
June 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS ORDER GRANTING PETITIONER'S REQUEST FOREXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE REPLY/TRAVERSE [ECF NO. 12] by Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani: For the reasons states above, the Court GRANTS Petitioner's extension. Petitioner's reply/traverse will be due on July 23, 2020. Petitioner is advised that any further requests for enlargement of time will be granted sparingly and only for good cause. (dc)
June 12, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Reply to the Respondent's Answer filed by Petitioner Donald J. Peel. (hr)
May 18, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWER to Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2254) #1 filed by Respondent Jusino. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Harry Miller, #2 Proof of Service)(Ben-Shmuel, Eliezer)
March 16, 2020 Filing 10 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Eliezer Ben-Shmuel counsel for Respondent Jusino. Adding Eliezer Ben-Shmuel as counsel of record for Warden T. Jusino for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Respondent T. Jusino. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Attorney Eliezer Ben-Shmuel added to party Jusino(pty:res))(Ben-Shmuel, Eliezer)
March 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REQUIRING ANSWER/RETURN TO PETITION by Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani. that Respondent Jusino file Answer to the Petition not later than 5/18/2020. Pursuant to the Agreement on Acceptance of Service between the Clerk of Court and the United States Attorneys Office, this Notice constitutes service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4.Notice: The court has issued a ruling on preliminary review. (Attachments: #1 2241 Petition) (dc)
March 3, 2020 Filing 7 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani: granting #2 MOTION to Proceed in Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60). (dc)
February 24, 2020 Filing 9 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by petitioner Donald J. Peel. [filed in Eastern District of California 2/24/20] (esa)
February 12, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF REFERENCE to a U.S. Magistrate Judge. This case has been assigned to the calendar of the Honorable District Judge Dale S. Fischer and referred to Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani, who is authorized to consider preliminary matters and conduct all further hearings as may be appropriate or necessary. Pursuant to Local Rule 83-2.4, the Court must be notified within five (5) days of any address change. See notice for additional details. (Attachments: #1 CV38) (esa)
February 12, 2020 Filing 5 ORIGINAL file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received from California Eastern
February 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 2/11/2020 ORDERING CASE TRANSFERRED to the U.S. District Court for the Central District of California. (Henshaw, R) [Transferred from California Eastern on 2/12/2020.]
February 12, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #4 Order served on Donald J. Peel. (Henshaw, R) [Transferred from California Eastern on 2/12/2020.]
February 7, 2020 Filing 3 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 3/12/2020. (Attachments: #1 Litigant Letter) (Coll, A) [Transferred from California Eastern on 2/12/2020.]
February 7, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Donald J. Peel. (Coll, A) [Transferred from California Eastern on 2/12/2020.]
February 6, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Donald J. Peel. (Coll, A) Modified on 2/10/2020 (Plummer, M). [Transferred from California Eastern on 2/12/2020.] Modified on 2/12/2020 (esa).
February 6, 2020 Filing 1 2241 PETITION for WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS against Jusino by Donald J. Peel.(Coll, A) [Transferred from California Eastern on 2/12/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Peel v. Entzel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Donald J. Peel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jusino
Represented By: Eliezer Ben-Shmuel
Represented By: Bureau of Prisons Regional Counsel
Represented By: US Attorney's Office- 2241 Unit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: F Entzel
Represented By: W. Scott Simpson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?