Kainz et al v. Illinois Department of Corrections (IDOC) et al
Plaintiff: Heather Kainz, Sara Bailey, Rebecca Buczkowski and Sabrina Fox
Defendant: Illinois Department of Corrections (IDOC), Jeffreys Rob, Leonta Jackson, Kennedy Teri, Emily Ruskin, Renzi Kelly, Sokol John, Wexford Health Sources Inc, Rob Jeffreys, Teri Kennedy, Kelly Renzi and John Sokol
Case Number: 1:2021cv01250
Filed: September 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Jonathan E Hawley
Referring Judge: Joe Billy McDade
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 451
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2021 Filing 58 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Amended Complaint by Plaintiffs Sara Bailey, Rebecca Buczkowski, Sabrina Fox, Heather Kainz. Responses due by 11/19/2021 (Turchyn, Matthew)
October 27, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #57 Motion to Strike entered by Judge Joe Billy McDade on 10/27/2021. (EWL)
October 26, 2021 Filing 57 MOTION to Strike THE NOVEMBER 2, 2021 DATE TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANTS MOTIONS TO DISMISS AND MOTION TO STRIKE by Plaintiffs Sara Bailey, Rebecca Buczkowski, Sabrina Fox, Heather Kainz. Responses due by 11/9/2021 (Turchyn, Matthew)
October 21, 2021 Filing 56 MEMORANDUM in Support of Its re #55 MOTION to Dismiss the Title VII Claims of Plaintiffs Rebecca Buczowski and Sabrina Fox, on behalf of Themselves and a Class of Similarly Situated Persons by Wexford Health Sources Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Baker-Seal, Denise)
October 21, 2021 Filing 55 MOTION to Dismiss the Title VII Claims of Plaintiffs Rebecca Buczowski and Sabrina Fox, on behalf of Themselves and a Class of Similarly Situated Persons by Defendant Wexford Health Sources Inc. Responses due by 11/4/2021 (Baker-Seal, Denise)
October 21, 2021 Filing 54 MEMORANDUM in Support of re #53 MOTION to Strike #1 Complaint by John Sokol, Wexford Health Sources Inc. (Baker-Seal, Denise)
October 21, 2021 Filing 53 STRICKEN PURSUANT TO THE 10/27/21 TEXT ORDER: MOTION to Strike #1 Complaint by Defendants John Sokol, Wexford Health Sources Inc. Responses due by 11/4/2021 (Baker-Seal, Denise) Modified on 10/29/2021 (FDS).
October 21, 2021 Filing 52 ANSWER to #1 Complaint AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES by Wexford Health Sources Inc.(Baker-Seal, Denise)
October 21, 2021 Filing 51 ANSWER to #1 Complaint AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES by John Sokol.(Baker-Seal, Denise)
October 21, 2021 Filing 50 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by John Sokol, Wexford Health Sources Inc. (Baker-Seal, Denise)
October 21, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #49 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Lisa A Cook terminated as counsel in this case as AAG Xinyi Wei has entered an appearance. Entered by Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley on 10/21/21. (WG)
October 20, 2021 Filing 49 MOTION to Substitute Attorney, AAG Lisa Cook to be replaced by AAG Xinyi Wei, by Defendants Teri Kennedy, Kelly Renzi, Emily Ruskin. Responses due by 11/3/2021 (Wei, Xinyi)
October 20, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #48 unopposed second Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or otherwise plead. Deadline for Dfts Teri Kennedy, Kelly Renzi, and Emily Ruskin is extended to 11/18/2021. Entered by Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley on 10/20/21. (WG)
October 19, 2021 Filing 48 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendants Teri Kennedy, Kelly Renzi, Emily Ruskin. Responses due by 11/2/2021 (Wei, Xinyi)
October 19, 2021 Filing 47 Partial ANSWER to #1 Complaint AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES by Illinois Department of Corrections (IDOC), Leonta Jackson, Rob Jeffreys.(Petrolis, Erin)
October 19, 2021 Filing 46 MEMORANDUM in Support re #45 MOTION to Dismiss in Part Pursuant to Federal Rule 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) filed by Defendants Illinois Department of Corrections (IDOC), Leonta Jackson, Rob Jeffreys. (Petrolis, Erin)
October 19, 2021 Filing 45 MOTION to Dismiss in Part Pursuant to Federal Rule 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) by Defendants Illinois Department of Corrections (IDOC), Leonta Jackson, Rob Jeffreys. Responses due by 11/2/2021 (Petrolis, Erin)
October 19, 2021 Filing 44 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Xinyi Wei on behalf of Teri Kennedy, Kelly Renzi, Emily Ruskin (Wei, Xinyi)
October 15, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #43 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Alan Remy Taborga, Abigail Durkin and Erin M Petrolis terminated as counsel for Dft Renzi as Attorney Lisa Cook has previously entered her appearance. Entered by Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley on 10/15/21. (WG)
October 14, 2021 Filing 43 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Defendant Kelly Renzi. Responses due by 10/28/2021 (Petrolis, Erin)
October 13, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #42 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer.Defendants Teri Kennedy, Kelly Renzi and Emily Ruskin shall answer by 10/19/2021. Entered by Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley on 10/13/21. (WG)
October 8, 2021 Filing 42 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Defendants Teri Kennedy, Kelly Renzi, Emily Ruskin. Responses due by 10/22/2021 (Cook, Lisa)
October 8, 2021 Filing 41 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Lisa A Cook on behalf of Teri Kennedy, Kelly Renzi, Emily Ruskin (Cook, Lisa)
October 8, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER: Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint is GRANTED. Defendanst IDOC, Jeffreys, Jackson, Wexford, and Sokol's answer or other responsive pleading is due by 10/19/2021. Entered by Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley on 10/8/2021. (KZ)
October 7, 2021 Filing 40 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint (Unopposed) by Defendants Illinois Department of Corrections (IDOC), Leonta Jackson, Rob Jeffreys. Responses due by 10/21/2021 (Petrolis, Erin)
September 30, 2021 Filing 39 PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 9/30/2021 9:59:26 AM ]. File Size [ 1201 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:02:30 ]. (admin).
September 30, 2021 Filing 38 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Maria DE Las Nieves Bolanos on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Bolanos, Maria DE Las Nieves)
September 30, 2021 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley: Parties present via telephone conference by Attys Maria De Las Nieves Bolanos, Patricia Stambler, Denise Baker-Seal and Erin Petrolis for Status Conference held on 9/30/2021. Discussion held regarding status. (Tape #PRC: 9:59 a.m.) (AH)
September 29, 2021 Filing 37 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Elizabeth Thomson on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Thomson, Elizabeth)
September 29, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #36 Agreed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. All Defendants to file their responsive pleading by 10/8/2021. Entered by Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley on 9/29/21. (WG)
September 28, 2021 Filing 36 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Agreed to by Defendants Illinois Department of Corrections (IDOC), Leonta Jackson, Wexford Health Sources Inc, Rob Jeffreys, Kelly Renzi, John Sokol. Responses due by 10/12/2021 (Holliday, Jessica)
September 27, 2021 Filing 35 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Abigail Durkin on behalf of Illinois Department of Corrections (IDOC), Leonta Jackson, Renzi Kelly, Jeffreys Rob (Durkin, Abigail)
September 23, 2021 Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Matthew J Turchyn on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Turchyn, Matthew)
September 23, 2021 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Patricia A Stamler on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Stamler, Patricia)
September 22, 2021 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Alan Remy Taborga on behalf of Illinois Department of Corrections (IDOC), Leonta Jackson, Renzi Kelly, Jeffreys Rob (Taborga, Alan)
September 21, 2021 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Erin M Petrolis on behalf of Leonta Jackson, Renzi Kelly (Petrolis, Erin)
September 16, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER: Pursuant to the Transfer of this case to the CDIL on 9/8/21, a Status Conference is set for 9/30/2021 at 10:00 AM via telephone before Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley. Counsel are to phone into conference by calling 571-353-2300, then enter 287753270#. Please announce your name each time prior to speaking unless the judge asks a question directly to you so that the speaker may be identified by all. Entered by Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley on 9/16/21. (WG)
September 8, 2021 Filing 30 Case transferred in from District of Illinois Northern; Case Number 1:21-cv-03239. .
September 8, 2021 Filing 29 TRANSFERRED to the USDC Central District of Illinois, Urbana Division the electronic record. (kl, )
September 8, 2021 Filing 28 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John F. Kness: Before the Court is Defendants' unopposed amended motion #23 to transfer this case to the United States District Court for the Central District of Illinois. For the reasons stated in the motion and the supporting memorandum #22 , a transfer is appropriate under 28 U.S.C. 1404(a). Accordingly, the motion to transfer is granted, and the case is transferred to the Central District of Illinois forthwith. The time for Defendants to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint is held in abeyance pending docketing of the transfer in the Central District. Defendants' earlier and duplicative motion to transfer #21 is dismissed as moot. Mailed notice (ags)
September 7, 2021 Filing 27 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Sokol John, Wexford Health Sources Inc by Jessica Schneider Holliday (Holliday, Jessica)
September 7, 2021 Filing 26 STIPULATION regarding motion to amend/correct, #23 Motion to Transfer Venue (Baker-Seal, Denise)
September 7, 2021 Filing 25 Jury Demand by Sokol John, Wexford Health Sources Inc (Baker-Seal, Denise)
September 7, 2021 Filing 24 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Sokol John, Wexford Health Sources Inc by Denise E Baker-Seal (Baker-Seal, Denise)
September 3, 2021 Filing 23 MOTION by Defendants Illinois Department of Corrections (IDOC), Jeffreys Rob to amend/correct MOTION by Defendants Illinois Department of Corrections (IDOC), Jeffreys Rob to transfer case to the United States District Court for the Central District of Illinois #21 (Amended Agreed Motion to Transfer) (Petrolis, Erin)
September 3, 2021 Filing 22 MEMORANDUM by Illinois Department of Corrections (IDOC), Jeffreys Rob in support of motion to transfer case #21 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Petrolis, Erin)
September 3, 2021 Filing 21 MOTION by Defendants Illinois Department of Corrections (IDOC), Jeffreys Rob to transfer case to the United States District Court for the Central District of Illinois (Petrolis, Erin)
August 31, 2021 Filing 20 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Illinois Department of Corrections (IDOC), Jeffreys Rob by Erin M. Petrolis (Petrolis, Erin)
August 17, 2021 Filing 19 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Rebecca Buczkowski, Sara Bailey, Sabrina Fox, Heather Kainz. Sokol John waiver sent on 7/9/2021, answer due 9/7/2021. (Turchyn, Matthew)
August 17, 2021 Filing 18 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Rebecca Buczkowski, Sara Bailey, Sabrina Fox, Heather Kainz. Emily Ruskin waiver sent on 7/9/2021, answer due 9/7/2021. (Turchyn, Matthew)
August 17, 2021 Filing 17 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Rebecca Buczkowski, Sara Bailey, Sabrina Fox, Heather Kainz. Kennedy Teri waiver sent on 7/9/2021, answer due 9/7/2021. (Turchyn, Matthew)
August 17, 2021 Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Rebecca Buczkowski, Sara Bailey, Sabrina Fox, Heather Kainz. Leonta Jackson waiver sent on 7/9/2021, answer due 9/7/2021. (Turchyn, Matthew)
July 28, 2021 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Rebecca Buczkowski, Sara Bailey, Sabrina Fox, Heather Kainz. Wexford Health Sources Inc waiver sent on 7/9/2021, answer due 9/7/2021. (Turchyn, Matthew)
July 26, 2021 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Rebecca Buczkowski, Sara Bailey, Sabrina Fox, Heather Kainz. Renzi Kelly waiver sent on 7/9/2021, answer due 9/7/2021. (Turchyn, Matthew)
July 26, 2021 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Rebecca Buczkowski, Sara Bailey, Sabrina Fox, Heather Kainz. Jeffreys Rob waiver sent on 7/9/2021, answer due 9/7/2021. (Turchyn, Matthew)
July 26, 2021 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Rebecca Buczkowski, Sara Bailey, Sabrina Fox, Heather Kainz. Illinois Department of Corrections (IDOC) waiver sent on 7/9/2021, answer due 9/7/2021. (Turchyn, Matthew)
July 13, 2021 Filing 11 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Sara Bailey, Rebecca Buczkowski, Sabrina Fox, Heather Kainz by John M Carmody (Carmody, John)
July 13, 2021 Filing 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Sara Bailey, Rebecca Buczkowski, Sabrina Fox, Heather Kainz by Karen Munoz (Munoz, Karen)
July 13, 2021 Filing 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Sara Bailey, Rebecca Buczkowski, Sabrina Fox, Heather Kainz by Martin A. Dolan (Dolan, Martin)
June 23, 2021 Filing 8 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John F. Kness: Motions by counsel for leave to appear pro hac vice #5 #6 #7 are granted. Mailed notice (ef, )
June 23, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-18380128. (Thomson, Elizabeth)
June 22, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-18376064. (Stamler, Patricia)
June 22, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-18375986. (Turchyn, Matthew)
June 17, 2021 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable John F. Kness. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sheila M. Finnegan. Case assignment: Random assignment. (cp, )
June 16, 2021 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Sara Bailey, Rebecca Buczkowski, Sabrina Fox, Heather Kainz by Maria De Las Nieves Bolanos (Bolanos, Maria)
June 16, 2021 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Sara Bailey, Rebecca Buczkowski, Sabrina Fox, Heather Kainz by Robin B. Potter (Potter, Robin)
June 16, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Potter, Robin)
June 16, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Rebecca Buczkowski, Sara Bailey, Sabrina Fox, Heather Kainz; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-18361925.(Potter, Robin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kainz et al v. Illinois Department of Corrections (IDOC) et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heather Kainz
Represented By: Maria De Las Nieves Bolanos
Represented By: Elizabeth C Thomson
Represented By: John M Carmody
Represented By: Karen Munoz
Represented By: Martin A Dolan
Represented By: Matthew J Turchyn
Represented By: Patricia A Stamler
Represented By: Robin B Potter
Represented By: Elizabeth Thomson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sara Bailey
Represented By: Maria De Las Nieves Bolanos
Represented By: Elizabeth C Thomson
Represented By: John M Carmody
Represented By: Karen Munoz
Represented By: Martin A Dolan
Represented By: Matthew J Turchyn
Represented By: Patricia A Stamler
Represented By: Robin B Potter
Represented By: Elizabeth Thomson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rebecca Buczkowski
Represented By: Maria De Las Nieves Bolanos
Represented By: Elizabeth C Thomson
Represented By: John M Carmody
Represented By: Karen Munoz
Represented By: Martin A Dolan
Represented By: Matthew J Turchyn
Represented By: Patricia A Stamler
Represented By: Robin B Potter
Represented By: Elizabeth Thomson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sabrina Fox
Represented By: Maria De Las Nieves Bolanos
Represented By: Elizabeth C Thomson
Represented By: John M Carmody
Represented By: Karen Munoz
Represented By: Martin A Dolan
Represented By: Matthew J Turchyn
Represented By: Patricia A Stamler
Represented By: Robin B Potter
Represented By: Elizabeth Thomson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Illinois Department of Corrections (IDOC)
Represented By: Erin M Petrolis
Represented By: Abigail Durkin
Represented By: Alan Remy Taborga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffreys Rob
Represented By: Erin M Petrolis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leonta Jackson
Represented By: Erin M Petrolis
Represented By: Abigail Durkin
Represented By: Alan Remy Taborga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kennedy Teri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emily Ruskin
Represented By: Lisa A Cook
Represented By: Xinyi Wei
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Renzi Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sokol John
Represented By: Denise E Baker-Seal
Represented By: Jessica Schneider Holliday
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wexford Health Sources Inc
Represented By: Denise E Baker-Seal
Represented By: Jessica Schneider Holliday
Represented By: Denise Baker-Seal
Represented By: Jessica S. Holliday
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rob Jeffreys
Represented By: Erin M Petrolis
Represented By: Abigail Durkin
Represented By: Alan Remy Taborga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teri Kennedy
Represented By: Lisa A Cook
Represented By: Xinyi Wei
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelly Renzi
Represented By: Erin M Petrolis
Represented By: Lisa A Cook
Represented By: Abigail Durkin
Represented By: Alan Remy Taborga
Represented By: Xinyi Wei
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Sokol
Represented By: Denise Baker-Seal
Represented By: Jessica S. Holliday
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?