Crawford v. Federal Bureau Of Prisons et al
Petitioner: Antonio D Crawford
Respondent: Federal Bureau of Prisons
Case Number: 1:2021cv01254
Filed: September 3, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: James E Shadid
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1361
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 7, 2021 Filing 6 Case transferred in from District of Illinois Northern; Case Number 1:21-cv-04622. .
September 3, 2021 Filing 5 TRANSFERRED to the USDC Central District of Illinois, Peoria Division the electronic record. (exr, )
September 2, 2021 ***Civil Case Terminated. (exr, )
September 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: Federal prisoner Antonio "Asia" Crawford initiated this lawsuit in this Court by filing a document she titles a "writ of mandamus petition." (See Dkt. #1 .) A review of that document, however, shows that Petitioner is requesting that the Court vacate her conviction in United States v. Crawford, no. 1:13-cv-10048 (C.D. Ill.) (Shadid, J.), for mailing threatening communications. (Id., pg. 12.) Therefore, although nominally a petition for a writ of mandamus, Petitioner's current request for relief appears to be an attempt at relief pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2255, which cannot be brought in this Court. Such petitions must be brought in "the court which imposed the sentence." 28 U.S.C. 2255(a). The Central District of Illinois thus appears to be the proper court for her 2255 motion. Accordingly, the Clerk is directed to: (1) change Petitioner's prisoner ID on the docket to 43793-424, (2) change the Nature of Suit for this case to a 2255 motion (510); and (3) transfer this case forthwith to the Central District of Illinois, Peoria Division for whatever action the transferee court deems appropriate. See 28 U.S.C. 1631 (a court that lacks jurisdiction to address a cause of action may transfer it to a court that has jurisdiction). This case and all pending motions are terminated on this Court's docket. Civil case transferred. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 9/2/2021. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
August 30, 2021 Filing 3 LETTER from Antonio Crawford dated 08/15/2021. (daj, )
August 30, 2021 Filing 2 PRISONER CIVIL Cover Sheet (daj, )
August 30, 2021 Filing 1 RECEIVED MOTION by Plaintiff Antonio Crawford for writ of mandamus. (Envelope postmarked 08/19/2021) (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(daj, )
August 30, 2021 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable M. David Weisman. FEE DUE, NO INFORMA PAUPERIS APPLICATION SUBMITTED. Case assignment: Random assignment. (daj, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Crawford v. Federal Bureau Of Prisons et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Antonio D Crawford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Federal Bureau of Prisons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?