Dib, M.D. v. Quincy Physicians & Surgeons Clinic, S.C., d/b/a Quincy Medical Group, an Illinois Corporation
Plaintiff: Marwan Dib, M.D.
Defendant: Quincy Physicians & Surgeons Clinic, S.C., d/b/a Quincy Medical Group, an Illinois Corporation
Case Number: 1:2021cv01339
Filed: November 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Jonathan E Hawley
Referring Judge: Joe Billy McDade
2 Judge: Sue E Myerscough
3 Judge: Tom Schanzle-Haskins
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 11, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 11, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Maryam H Arfeen on behalf of Marwan Dib, M.D. (Arfeen, Maryam)
December 29, 2021 NOTICE OF HEARING: Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set Tuesday, 2/1/2022, at 9:00 AM (court will place call) before U.S. Magistrate Judge Tom Schanzle-Haskins. Attorneys are directed to comply with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f) by meeting as soon as practicable, and in any event at least fourteen (14) days prior to the scheduling conference, and are to submit a proposed discovery plan in writing to the Court on or before 1/28/2022. Such a plan must include, at a minimum, those items listed in CDIL-LR 26.2(3), Rule 16(b), Rule 26(f), and CDIL-LR 16.2(E) with proposed deadlines. The parties are directed to specifically address the provisions, if any, for discovery or disclosure of electronically stored information, and to discuss agreements, if any, the parties reach for asserting claims of privilege or of protection as trial preparation material, after inadvertent production. Any plan filed shall specifically address the need, or lack thereof, concerning discovery of electronically stored information. If a discovery plan is not submitted as required, the scheduling hearing will not be held and costs may be assessed. Lead counsel or other counsel of record with knowledge of the case should be available to participate in the Rule 16 scheduling hearing. (LB)
December 28, 2021 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES by Quincy Physicians & Surgeons Clinic, S.C., d/b/a Quincy Medical Group, an Illinois Corporation.(Penn, David)
December 22, 2021 Filing 7 Designation of Lead Counsel by David Grant Penn on behalf of Quincy Physicians & Surgeons Clinic, S.C., d/b/a Quincy Medical Group, an Illinois Corporation. (Penn, David)
December 22, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by David Grant Penn on behalf of Quincy Physicians & Surgeons Clinic, S.C., d/b/a Quincy Medical Group, an Illinois Corporation (Penn, David)
December 22, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement (Hansen, James)
December 22, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by James A Hansen on behalf of Quincy Physicians & Surgeons Clinic, S.C., d/b/a Quincy Medical Group, an Illinois Corporation (Hansen, James)
November 29, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #3 the Plaintiff's Motion to Transfer. The Clerk is directed to TRANSFER this case to the Springfield Division of the U.S. District Court for the Central District of Illinois. Entered by Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley on 11/29/2021. (KZ)
November 23, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION to Transfer Case PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO TRANSFER by Plaintiff Marwan Dib, M.D.. Responses due by 12/7/2021 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Gibson, Amy)
November 18, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER: The Plaintiff is directed to show cause by 11/24/2021 why this case should not be transferred to the Springfield Division of the U.S. District Court for the Central District of Illinois. The caption of the Complaint #1 does not identify the division in which this case is pending, and the statement of jurisdiction does not state the basis for filing in the division selected (Peoria). See Civil LR 40.1(E), (F). Also, the Complaint alleges that this district is the one in which the Defendant resides and where a substantial portion of the events and omissions underlying this lawsuit occurred, and the Plaintiff worked for the Defendant in Quincy, Illinois. Quincy, Illinois is within Adams County which is, in turn, within the Springfield Division of this Court. Civil LR 40.1(B). Entered by Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley on 11/18/2021. (KZ)
November 17, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Quincy Physicians & Surgeons Clinic, S.C., d/b/a Quincy Medical Group, an Illinois Corporation. Issued Summons mailed to Plaintiff's Counsel at Amy M. Gibson, Aronberg Goldgehn, 330 N. Wabash, Suite 1700, Chicago, IL 60611. (AH)
November 17, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Quincy Physicians & Surgeons Clinic, S.C., d/b/a Quincy Medical Group, an Illinois Corporation ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AILCDC-3806642.), filed by Marwan Dib, M.D.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit Group Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit Exhibit J)(Gibson, Amy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dib, M.D. v. Quincy Physicians & Surgeons Clinic, S.C., d/b/a Quincy Medical Group, an Illinois Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marwan Dib, M.D.
Represented By: Amy Gibson
Represented By: Maryam H Arfeen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quincy Physicians & Surgeons Clinic, S.C., d/b/a Quincy Medical Group, an Illinois Corporation
Represented By: David Grant Penn
Represented By: James A Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?