Eaton et al v. Treto
Plaintiff: Gareld Eaton and Robert Bruno
Defendant: Acting Secretary Mario Treto and Mario Treto, Jr.
Case Number: 1:2022cv01182
Filed: May 26, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Jonathan E Hawley
Referring Judge: Michael M Mihm
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201 Constitutionality of State Statute(s)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 22, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2022 Filing 18 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Robert Bruno. (Mannlein, Melinda)
July 22, 2022 Remark: Civil Case Terminated pursuant to #18 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal. (JS)
July 22, 2022 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER: This case was inadvertently closed as to all parties based on Plaintiff Robert Bruno's #18 Notice of Dismissal with Prejudice, which by its terms dismisses the suit with prejudice only as to Mr. Bruno. The Clerk is directed to REOPEN the case as Plaintiff Gerald Eaton. Plaintiff Robert Bruno's claims remain terminated with prejudice. Entered by Judge Michael M. Mihm on 7/22/2022. (JS)
June 27, 2022 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER DENYING Defendant's Motion to Seal (ECF No. 11) as moot. Plaintiffs have confirmed that they do not object to the documents subject to Defendant's Motion to Seal being public (ECF No. 14), and Defendant has now publicly filed the documents it moved to file under seal. Accordingly, Defendant's Motion for Leave to File Documents under Seal #11 is DENIED as moot. Entered by Judge Michael M. Mihm on 6/27/2022. (VH)
June 22, 2022 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Michael M. Mihm: Motion Hearing held 6/22/2022 in Courtroom A in Peoria. Plaintiffs appear by Atty Melinda Mannlein present in person and Atty Ben Stelter-Embry via video. Defendant appears by Attys R. Douglas Rees and Richard Huszagh present in person. #17 Motion for Leave to appear Pro Hac Vice and to Participate Remotely is GRANTED. Oral arguments by the parties re #5 Plaintiffs Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction. Court DENIES #5 Motion for reasons as stated on the record. Written Order to enter. The courts ruling is not final until the written Order is entered. (Court Reporter JJ.) (AH)
June 21, 2022 Filing 17 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice and to participate remotely by Plaintiffs Robert Bruno, Gareld Eaton. Responses due by 7/5/2022 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1: Application for Admission)(Mannlein, Melinda)
June 17, 2022 Filing 16 REPLY to Response to Motion re #5 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Plaintiffs Robert Bruno, Gareld Eaton. (Mannlein, Melinda)
June 17, 2022 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Richard Scott Huszagh on behalf of Mario Treto, Jr (Huszagh, Richard)
June 16, 2022 Filing 14 RESPONSE to Motion re #11 MOTION for Leave to File Document Under Seal filed by Plaintiffs Robert Bruno, Gareld Eaton. (Mannlein, Melinda)
June 16, 2022 Filing 13 RESPONSE to Motion re #5 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction filed by Defendant Mario Treto, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, Walsh Declaration, #2 Exhibit 2, IL S.Ct consolidation order, #3 Exhibit 3, circuit court consolidation order, #4 Exhibit 4, remand for corrective lotteries, #5 Exhibit 5, order lifting stay on licenses, #6 Exhibit 6, Finch Mem.Op. & Order, #7 Exhibit 7, Houston Affidavit, #8 Exhibit 8, Leung Declaration, #9 Exhibit 9, Lopez Declaration)(Rees, R.)
June 13, 2022 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER entered by Judge Michael M. Mihm on 6/13/2022. Pending before the Court is Defendant's Motion to Seal (ECF No. 11). Defendant explains that he has included certain information regarding Plaintiff's dispensary application that may be deemed confidential under Illinois law. Defendant represents that he attempted to confer with Plaintiffs' counsel to determine if Plaintiffs have any objection to the declaration and its contents being included in the public record. Plaintiffs' counsel apparently did not respond to Defendant's phone and email inquiries. As Defendant notes, there is a strong presumption that information be publicly available. After a brief review of Defendant's filing, the Court is inclined to find that there the information is not so sensitive as to required it be withheld from the public. It is also Plaintiffs who have created the public interest in this information through the filing of this lawsuit. However, the Court will allow Plaintiffs' counsel to respond. Plaintiffs' Counsel is ORDERED to respond whether Plaintiffs have any objection to Defendant filing his brief (ECF No. 12) and exhibits on the public docket on or before June 16, 2022. (VH)
June 10, 2022 Filing 12 +++ SEALED DOCUMENT.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Walsh Declaration (sealed), #2 Exhibit IL S. Ct. Rule 384 Order, #3 Exhibit Consolidation Order, #4 Exhibit Lottery Remand Order, #5 Exhibit Order Lifting Stay, #6 Exhibit Finch Mem. Op. & Order, #7 Exhibit Houston Affidavit, #8 Exhibit Leung Declaration, #9 Exhibit Lopez Declaration)(Rees, R.)
June 10, 2022 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to File Document Under Seal by Defendant Mario Treto, Jr. Responses due by 6/24/2022 (Rees, R.)
June 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 AGREED SCHEDULING ORDER entered by Judge Michael M. Mihm on 6/1/2022. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED AS FOLLOWS:1. Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages #8 is granted.2. Defendant may file a response to Plaintiffs' Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction #5 by June 10, 2022. Defendant is excused from the default page limits in Local Rule 7.1(B)(4) and is allowed to file up to 35 pages for his response brief.3. Plaintiffs may file a reply brief by June 17, 2022.4. The hearing on Plaintiffs' motion set for June 2, 2022, is VACATED and RESET for June 22, 2022, at 1:00 p.m. in Courtroom B in Peoria. See full written Order(VH)
May 27, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by R. Douglas Rees on behalf of All Defendants (Rees, R.)
May 27, 2022 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages re Document 6 by Plaintiffs Robert Bruno, Gareld Eaton. Responses due by 6/10/2022 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Mannlein, Melinda)
May 27, 2022 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of Service/Counsel re #6 Memorandum, #1 Complaint, #5 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Melinda L Mannlein on behalf of Robert Bruno, Gareld Eaton (Mannlein, Melinda)
May 27, 2022 Opinion or Order ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion #5 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order : Motion Hearing set for 6/2/2022 at 01:00 PM in Courtroom B in Peoria before Judge Michael M. Mihm. Defendant is directed to file his Response to #5 by 6/1/2022 at 3:00 p.m. Entered by Judge Michael M. Mihm on 5/27/2022. (MDB)
May 26, 2022 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM in Support re #5 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Robert Bruno, Gareld Eaton. (Mannlein, Melinda)
May 26, 2022 Filing 5 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Plaintiffs Robert Bruno, Gareld Eaton. Responses due by 6/9/2022 (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Exhibit 1: Affidavit of Gareld Eaton, #2 Affidavit Exhibit 2: Affidavit of Robert Bruno)(Mannlein, Melinda)
May 26, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Melinda L Mannlein on behalf of Robert Bruno, Gareld Eaton (Mannlein, Melinda)
May 26, 2022 Filing 3 Designation of Lead Counsel by Melinda L Mannlein on behalf of Robert Bruno, Gareld Eaton. (Mannlein, Melinda)
May 26, 2022 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTEREST pursuant to Local Rule 11.3 by Robert Bruno, Gareld Eaton. (Mannlein, Melinda)
May 26, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against Mario Treto ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AILCDC-3949183.), filed by Gareld Eaton, Robert Bruno. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Mannlein, Melinda)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eaton et al v. Treto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gareld Eaton
Represented By: Melinda L Mannlein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Bruno
Represented By: Melinda L Mannlein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting Secretary Mario Treto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mario Treto, Jr.
Represented By: R. Douglas Rees
Represented By: Richard Scott Huszagh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?