Hohenbery v. Cascade Spring Credit et al
Plaintiff: Chad Hohenbery
Defendant: Cascade Spring Credit, Raycen Raines, III, Cascade Springs Credit, Black Hills Credit, Wakpamni Lake Community Corporation, Geneva Lone Hill, Bret A. Crandall, Raycen American Horse Raines, Raycen Ballard and John Does 1-20
Case Number: 1:2023cv01236
Filed: June 22, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Jonathan E Hawley
Referring Judge: James E Shadid
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1964 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 8, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 8, 2023 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER: Pursuant to the filing of the #14 Notice of Settlement and Request to Stay Deadlines, the Court sets a deadline of 9/22/2023 for the filing of a Stipulation to dismiss. All previous set deadlines are VACATED. Entered by Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley on 8/8/23. (WG) Modified on 8/8/2023 (WG).
August 7, 2023 Filing 14 NOTICE of Settlement and Request to Stay Deadlines (Goldstein, Matthew)
July 24, 2023 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Chad Hohenbery. Wakpamni Lake Community Corporation waiver sent on 7/13/2023, answer due 9/11/2023. (Goldstein, Matthew)
July 24, 2023 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Chad Hohenbery. Raycen Raines, III waiver sent on 7/13/2023, answer due 9/11/2023. (Goldstein, Matthew)
July 24, 2023 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Chad Hohenbery. Geneva Lone Hill waiver sent on 7/13/2023, answer due 9/11/2023. (Goldstein, Matthew)
July 24, 2023 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Chad Hohenbery. Cascade Spring Credit waiver sent on 7/13/2023, answer due 9/11/2023. (Goldstein, Matthew)
July 18, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Punit Kumar Marwaha on behalf of Bret A. Crandall (Marwaha, Punit)
July 18, 2023 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Chad Hohenbery. Bret A. Crandall served on 6/27/2023, answer due 7/18/2023. (Goldstein, Matthew)
July 18, 2023 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #7 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Defendant Bret A. Crandall's responsive pleading is due by 8/17/2023. Entered by Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley on 7/18/23. (WG)
July 17, 2023 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Defendant Bret A. Crandall. Responses due by 7/31/2023 (Marwaha, Punit)
June 23, 2023 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Cascade Spring Credit, Bret A. Crandall, Geneva Lone Hill, Raycen Raines, III, Wakpamni Lake Community Corporation.Summonses returned to attorney for service. (TK)
June 22, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Dulijaza Clark on behalf of Chad Hohenbery (Clark, Dulijaza)
June 22, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Tara Leigh Goodwin on behalf of Chad Hohenbery (Goodwin, Tara)
June 22, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Matthew J. Goldstein on behalf of Chad Hohenbery (Goldstein, Matthew)
June 22, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Daniel A Edelman on behalf of Chad Hohenbery (Edelman, Daniel)
June 22, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT - CLASS ACTION against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AILCDC-4235643.), filed by Chad Hohenbery. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-C, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons of Cascade Spring Credit, #4 Summons of Wakpamni Lake Community Corporation, #5 Summons of Geneva Lone Hill, #6 Summons of Bret A. Crandall, #7 Summons of Raycen Raines, III)(Edelman, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hohenbery v. Cascade Spring Credit et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cascade Spring Credit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raycen Raines, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cascade Springs Credit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Black Hills Credit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wakpamni Lake Community Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Geneva Lone Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bret A. Crandall
Represented By: Punit Kumar Marwaha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raycen American Horse Raines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raycen Ballard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chad Hohenbery
Represented By: Dulijaza Clark
Represented By: Matthew J. Goldstein
Represented By: Daniel A Edelman
Represented By: Tara Leigh Goodwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?