DuPage v. Butler et al
Plaintiff: Joshua DuPage
Defendant: Brett Butler, . Burris, John Doe, City of Pekin, Village of Creve Coeur and Catlin Deeb Deiver
Case Number: 1:2023cv01242
Filed: June 26, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Sara Darrow
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 11, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2023 Filing 15 +++ PRISONER TRUST FUND LEDGER as to Joshua DuPage (JJK)
July 25, 2023 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #5 Petition to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1915(b)(1), Plaintiff is assessed an initial partial filing fee of $11.36. The agency having custody of Plaintiff is directed to forward the initial partial filing fee from Plaintiff's account to the Clerk of Court within 30 days of this order. After payment of the initial partial filing fee (or immediately if no funds are available for that payment) the agency having custody of Plaintiff shall make monthly payments of 20 percent of the preceding month's income credited to Plaintiff's account to the Clerk of Court. Income includes all deposits from any source, including gifts. The agency having custody of the plaintiff shall forward these payments each time Plaintiff's account exceeds $10, until the filing fee of $350 is paid in full. The Clerk is directed to mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff's place of confinement, to the attention of the Trust Fund Office, and to Plaintiff. Prisoner Prepayment due by 8/24/2023. Entered by Chief Judge Sara Darrow on 7/25/2023. (SAG)
July 24, 2023 Filing 14 +++ PRISONER TRUST FUND LEDGER by Joshua DuPage (RES)
July 24, 2023 Filing 13 Letter from Joshua DuPage (RES)
July 19, 2023 Filing 12 NOTICE to the Court by Plaintiff Joshua DuPage. (RES)
July 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT ORDER entered by Chief Judge Sara Darrow on 7/17/2023. Plaintiff's Motions #9 #10 are GRANTED to the extent that Plaintiff seeks the Court to request from officials at his present place of confinement a copy of his trust fund ledgers. The Court has already done so, and it will rule upon Plaintiffs petition to proceed in forma pauperis once received. The motions #9 #10 are denied as to any other relief requested. There does not appear to be any pending deadlines that require Plaintiff to respond or to update the Court.(ANW)
July 13, 2023 Filing 10 MOTION (in letter form) for Extension of Time to File Responses or Answers by Plaintiff Joshua DuPage. Responses due by 7/27/2023 (RES)
July 13, 2023 Filing 9 MOTION to Update the Court by Plaintiff Joshua DuPage. Responses due by 7/27/2023 (RES)
July 11, 2023 Filing 8 Letter Requesting Trust Fund Ledger. Trust fund ledger sheets due by 7/25/2023. (SAG)
July 10, 2023 Filing 7 Letter from Joshua DuPage (Attachments: #1 envelope) (RES)
July 10, 2023 Filing 6 +++ PRISONER TRUST FUND LEDGER by Joshua DuPage (RES)
July 10, 2023 Filing 5 PETITION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, filed by Joshua DuPage. (Attachments: #1 envelope)(RES)
June 27, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE OF CASE OPENING. Please be advised that your case has been assigned to Chief Judge Sara Darrow. Effective immediately, all documents should be mailed or scanned to the Rock Island Division, 322 16th Street, Rock Island, IL 61201.Merit Review Deadline set for 7/17/2023. (Attachments: #1 Notice Regarding Privacy Issues)(SAG)
June 27, 2023 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Chief Judge Sara Darrow on 6/27/2023. Plaintiff has filed a Petition to Proceed in Forma Pauperis #3 that is insufficient as it is lacking information and is, therefore, denied with leave to renew. Plaintiff is directed to file a petition to proceed in forma pauperis setting forth his income, assets, and expenses on or before 7/11/2023. If Plaintiff fails to either pay the $402 filing fee or renew his IFP petition on or before 7/11/2023, his case will be dismissed. The Clerk is to provide Plaintiff with an IFP form to assist him. (SAG)
June 26, 2023 Filing 4 Letter from Plaintiff Joshua DuPage (SAG)
June 26, 2023 Filing 3 PETITION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, filed by Joshua DuPage.(SAG)
June 26, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Joshua DuPage.(SAG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DuPage v. Butler et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua DuPage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brett Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: . Burris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Pekin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Village of Creve Coeur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Catlin Deeb Deiver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?