Scott et al v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Malcolm Scott and Helen Probst Scott
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2023cv01392
Filed: October 18, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Jonathan E Hawley
Referring Judge: Joe Billy McDade
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 5, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 5, 2023 Filing 17 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Helen Probst Scott, Malcolm Scott. (DeSanto, Mark)
December 5, 2023 Remark: This case is closed pursuant to #17 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. (FDS)
November 28, 2023 Filing 16 Designation of Lead Counsel by Cari Katrice Dawson on behalf of State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Dawson, Cari)
November 28, 2023 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Cari Katrice Dawson on behalf of State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Dawson, Cari)
November 28, 2023 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Daniella Patricia Main on behalf of State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Main, Daniella)
November 22, 2023 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. Plaintiffs' Response to #10 Motion to Dismiss is now due on or by 12/29/2023. Entered by Judge Joe Billy McDade on 11/22/2023. (LH)
November 21, 2023 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM the Class Action Complaint [Unopposed] by Plaintiffs Helen Probst Scott, Malcolm Scott. Responses due by 12/5/2023 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeSanto, Mark)
November 15, 2023 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE of Compliance with Type Volume Limitation. (Heil, John)
November 15, 2023 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM In Support of re #10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM the Class Action Complaint by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Heil, John)
November 15, 2023 Filing 10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM the Class Action Complaint by Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. Responses due by 11/29/2023 (Heil, John)
October 31, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Amanda Allen on behalf of Helen Probst Scott, Malcolm Scott (Allen, Amanda)
October 31, 2023 Filing 8 STRICKEN PURSUANT TO TEXT ORDER ENTERED ON 10/31/2023NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by William Peerce Howard on behalf of Helen Probst Scott, Malcolm Scott (Howard, William) Modified on 10/31/2023 (VH).
October 31, 2023 Filing 7 STRICKEN PURSUANT TO TEXT ORDER ENTERED ON 10/31/2023NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by William Peerce Howard on behalf of Helen Probst Scott, Malcolm Scott (Howard, William) Modified on 10/31/2023 (VH).
October 31, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by William Peerce Howard on behalf of Helen Probst Scott, Malcolm Scott (Howard, William)
October 31, 2023 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER striking #7 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney and #8 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney. Counsel accidentally filed the same document three times. Entered by Judge Joe Billy McDade on 10/31/2023. (LH)
October 24, 2023 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER: The Joint Motion for Extension of Time for Defendant to Respond to Complaint #4 is GRANTED. The Defendant's answer or other responsive pleading is now due by 11/15/2023. Entered by Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley on 10/24/2023. (KZ)
October 24, 2023 Set/Reset Deadlines: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company answer due 11/15/2023. (KZ)
October 20, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Mark B DeSanto on behalf of Helen Probst Scott, Malcolm Scott (DeSanto, Mark)
October 18, 2023 Filing 4 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Complaint by Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. Responses due by 11/1/2023 (Heil, John)
October 18, 2023 Filing 3 Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 Disclosure Statement by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Heil, John)
October 18, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Jessica A Pullen on behalf of State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Pullen, Jessica)
October 18, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from McLean County, case number 2023 LA 114 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AILCDC-4322252), filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Class Action Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - Summons, #3 Exhibit 3 - Affidavit of Service of Summons, #4 Exhibit 4 - Declaration of Jonathan Owen, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Heil, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scott et al v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Malcolm Scott
Represented By: John G Albanese
Represented By: Eleanor Michelle Drake
Represented By: Amanda Allen
Represented By: Mark B DeSanto
Represented By: William Peerce Howard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Helen Probst Scott
Represented By: John G Albanese
Represented By: Eleanor Michelle Drake
Represented By: Amanda Allen
Represented By: Mark B DeSanto
Represented By: William Peerce Howard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By: Jessica A Pullen
Represented By: John P Heil, Jr
Represented By: Cari Katrice Dawson
Represented By: Daniella Patricia Main
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?