Freeman et al v. Dawson et al
Plaintiff: Keshawn Freeman, Raynada Jones, Herbie McBride, Mario Froylan, Darcell Prince and James Hughes
Defendant: James Dawson, Cherryle Hinthorne, Wexford Health Services Inc, Precise Specialties Inc, State of Illinois, Unknown Wexford Employees and Unknown Illinois Department of Corrections Employees
Case Number: 1:2023cv01423
Filed: November 15, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Colin Stirling Bruce
Referring Judge: Eric I Long
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison Conditions
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 12, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 12, 2024 Filing 43 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Wexford Health Sources' Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss Counts II, III & IV of Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint by Defendant Wexford Health Services Inc. Responses due by 1/26/2024 (Skarpiak, Chad)
January 10, 2024 Filing 42 Joint MOTION set briefing schedule with respect to motions to dismiss by Plaintiffs Keshawn Freeman, Mario Froylan, James Hughes, Raynada Jones, Herbie McBride, Darcell Prince. Responses due by 1/24/2024 (Weil, Stephen)
January 8, 2024 Filing 41 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Cherryle Hinthorne Written discovery to plaintiff (Watkiss, Paul)
January 8, 2024 Filing 40 MEMORANDUM in Support re #39 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Defendant Cherryle Hinthorne. (Watkiss, Paul)
January 8, 2024 Filing 39 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Cherryle Hinthorne. Responses due by 1/22/2024 (Watkiss, Paul)
January 8, 2024 Filing 38 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Paul O Watkiss on behalf of Cherryle Hinthorne (Watkiss, Paul)
January 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 37 TEXT ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 1/4/2024. The court hereby vacates the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 1/10/24. The court adopts the deadlines in the Parties' Agreed Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting #36 . The following deadlines are set: initial disclosures due 1/24/24, amended pleadings and joinder of parties due 5/24/24, Plaintiff's deadline to disclose experts and provide expert reports is 4/2/25, Plaintiff shall make experts available for deposition by 5/2/25, Defendant's deadline to disclose experts and provide expert reports is 6/3/25, Defendant shall make experts available for deposition by 7/3/25, discovery closes 8/5/25, case dispositive motions due 9/5/25. Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/2/26 at 10:30 AM, before Judge Colin S. Bruce, Courtroom A, Urbana. Jury Trial set for 2/17/26 at 9:00 AM, before Judge Colin S. Bruce, Courtroom A, Urbana. The court stresses the importance of adhering to the schedule and procedures for requests to extend the schedule. The parties are reminded of option of Court sponsored mediation/Settlement Conference. The Court directs the Clerk to provide the parties with a copy of the Court's consent to magistrate judge form. A telephone status conference is set for 6/5/24 at 10:45 AM, before Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long. The call-in number is 551-285-1373, then enter meeting ID 160 924 96574.(JMB)
January 3, 2024 Filing 36 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Keshawn Freeman, Mario Froylan, James Hughes, Raynada Jones, Herbie McBride, Darcell Prince. (Weil, Stephen)
December 28, 2023 Filing 35 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs Amended Complaint by Defendants James Dawson, Precise Specialties Inc. Responses due by 1/11/2024 (Riordan, Brian)
December 15, 2023 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Judge Colin Stirling Bruce on 12/15/2023. Plaintiff has filed an amended complaint #34 pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 15(a). Therefore, Defendants' motions to dismiss Plaintiff's Original Complaint #29 and #31 are DENIED AS MOOT. CSX Transportation, Inc. v. Zayo Grp., LLC, 2022 WL 1819519, * 2 (S.D. Ind. June 3, 2022)("[M]otions to dismiss are regularly denied as moot after an amended complaint is filed."). Defendants are ordered to file timely their answers or other responsive pleadings to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint pursuant to Federal Rule 12(a)(4)(A). (KE)
December 14, 2023 Filing 34 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by James Hughes, Herbie McBride, Raynada Jones, Keshawn Freeman, Mario Froylan, Darcell Prince.(Weil, Stephen)
December 4, 2023 Reset Hearings: Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 1/10/2024 at 9:45 AM in Courtroom B in Urbana before Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long. Hearing reset to correct a typographical error. (JMB)
December 1, 2023 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by James Robinson on behalf of Cherryle Hinthorne (Robinson, James)
December 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 12/1/2023. Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 1/10/2024 at 9:45 AM in Courtroom B in Urbana before Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long. See written order. (JMB) Modified on 12/4/2023 to correct a typographical error. (JMB)
November 30, 2023 Filing 31 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant Wexford Health Services Inc. Responses due by 12/14/2023 (Skarpiak, Chad)
November 30, 2023 Filing 30 MEMORANDUM in Support re #29 MOTION to Dismiss by James Dawson, Precise Specialties Inc. (Riordan, Brian)
November 30, 2023 Filing 29 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendants James Dawson, Precise Specialties Inc. Responses due by 12/14/2023 (Riordan, Brian)
November 27, 2023 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Chad M Skarpiak on behalf of Wexford Health Services Inc (Skarpiak, Chad)
November 22, 2023 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER Entered by Judge Colin Stirling Bruce on 11/22/23. The Court has learned, through other cases filed in this District, that attorney Mark Alanson is no longer with the Illinois Attorney General's Office. As a result, the Clerk of the Court is directed to terminate attorney Alanson's representation of Defendant Cherryle Hinthorne in this case. The Clerk is further directed to send a copy of this Order to Supervisor Alan Remy Taborga at: alan.taborga@ilag.gov so that the Illinois Attorney General's Office may reassign this case to another attorney to represent Defendant Hinthorne within the next fourteen (14) days. (ANW)
November 16, 2023 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 11/16/2023. The responsive pleading deadline for all Defendants is 11/30/23.(BMG)
November 15, 2023 Filing 27 Case transferred in from District of Illinois Northern; Case Number 1:23-cv-04250. .
November 15, 2023 Filing 26 TRANSFERRED to the U.S. District Court Central District of Illinois the electronic record. (daj, )
November 6, 2023 Filing 25 MINUTE entry before the Honorable LaShonda A. Hunt: Defendants' Unopposed Motion to Transfer Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C.S. 1404 and to Stay Responsive Pleadings Until the Case is Transferred #24 is granted. The Court hereby transfers this case forthwith to the United States District Court for the Central District of Illinois. The responsive pleadings deadline is stricken. All pending motions and other deadlines are terminated as moot. Emailed notice. (cdh, )
November 3, 2023 Filing 24 MOTION by Defendant Wexford Health Services, Inc. to transfer case Unopposed Joint motion Pursuant to 28 U.S.C.S. Sec. 1404 (Lombardo, Joseph)
October 12, 2023 Filing 23 MINUTE entry before the Honorable LaShonda A. Hunt: The unopposed motions of Defendant James Dawson and Precise Specialties, Inc. and Defendant Wexford Health Sources, Inc. to extend time to respond to the complaint #20 #21 are granted. Defendants Dawson, Precise Specialties, and Wexford must file their responses to Plaintiff's complaint by 11/3/23. The 10/19/23 deadline for Plaintiff to file an updated status report on service by 10/19/23 is stricken, and the parties are ordered to file a joint status report including a proposed discovery schedule by 11/9/23. The in-person status hearing set for 10/26/23 is stricken and reset to 11/16/23, at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1425. Emailed notice. (cdh, )
October 10, 2023 Filing 22 SUMMONS Returned Executed by James Hughes, Herbie McBride, Raynada Jones, Keshawn Freeman, Mario Froylan, Darcell Prince as to State of Illinois on 10/6/2023, answer due 10/27/2023. (Weil, Stephen)
October 9, 2023 Filing 21 MOTION by Defendant Wexford Health Services, Inc. for extension of time to file answer (Lombardo, Joseph)
October 6, 2023 Filing 20 MOTION by Defendants James Dawson, Precise Specialties, Inc. for extension of time to file answer regarding complaint #1 (Riordan, Brian)
October 4, 2023 Filing 19 MINUTE entry before the Honorable LaShonda A. Hunt: Defendant Cherryle Hinthorne's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint #18 is granted. Defendant Hinthorne's response to Plaintiff's Complaint is due by 10/31/23. Emailed notice. (cdh, )
October 3, 2023 Filing 18 MOTION by Defendant Cherryle Hinthorne for extension of time to file answer regarding complaint #1 (Alanson, Mark)
October 3, 2023 Filing 17 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Cherryle Hinthorne by Mark Loren Alanson (Alanson, Mark)
September 28, 2023 Filing 16 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Wexford Health Services, Inc. by Joseph Jack Lombardo (Lombardo, Joseph)
September 28, 2023 Filing 15 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Wexford Health Services, Inc. by Matthew H Weller (Weller, Matthew)
September 28, 2023 Filing 14 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants James Dawson, Precise Specialties, Inc. by Brian James Riordan (Riordan, Brian)
September 25, 2023 Filing 13 MINUTE entry before the Honorable LaShonda A. Hunt: The Court has reviewed Plaintiffs' Initial Status Report #12 , indicating that service was recently effectuated on several but not all of the defendants. Plaintiff is ordered to file an updated status report on service by 10/19/23, if all defendants have not yet been served. The in-person status hearing set for 9/28/23 is stricken and reset to 10/26/23, at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 1219. Emailed notice. (cdh, )
September 21, 2023 Filing 12 STATUS Report by Keshawn Freeman, Mario Froylan, James Hughes, Raynada Jones, Herbie McBride, Darcell Prince (Weil, Stephen)
September 21, 2023 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by James Hughes, Herbie McBride, Raynada Jones, Keshawn Freeman, Mario Froylan, Darcell Prince as to Precise Specialties, Inc. on 9/20/2023, answer due 10/11/2023. (Weil, Stephen)
September 21, 2023 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by James Hughes, Herbie McBride, Raynada Jones, Keshawn Freeman, Mario Froylan, Darcell Prince as to James Dawson on 9/20/2023, answer due 10/11/2023. (Weil, Stephen)
September 15, 2023 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Unexecuted by James Hughes, Herbie McBride, Raynada Jones, Keshawn Freeman, Mario Froylan, Darcell Prince as to State of Illinois. (Weil, Stephen)
September 15, 2023 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by James Hughes, Herbie McBride, Raynada Jones, Keshawn Freeman, Mario Froylan, Darcell Prince as to Wexford Health Services, Inc. on 9/12/2023, answer due 10/3/2023. (Weil, Stephen)
September 15, 2023 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by James Hughes, Herbie McBride, Raynada Jones, Keshawn Freeman, Mario Froylan, Darcell Prince as to Cherryle Hinthorne on 9/12/2023, answer due 10/3/2023. (Weil, Stephen)
September 7, 2023 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants James Dawson, Cherryle Hinthorne, Precise Specialties, Inc., State of Illinois, Wexford Health Services, Inc. (mcp, )
August 30, 2023 Filing 6 MINUTE entry before the Honorable LaShonda A. Hunt: The parties failed to comply with this Court's order to file a joint initial status report for new case by 8/24/23 #2 . According to the docket, there has been no further activity in this case since 7/20/23 when plaintiffs' counsel entered attorney appearances. It appears that plaintiffs have not effectuated service upon any of the defendants. Nevertheless, plaintiffs are obligated to file an initial status report as ordered by this Court or a motion requesting additional time to do so. The Court, on its own motion, will extend the deadline to file an initial status report to 9/21/23. The in-person status hearing set for 8/31/23 is stricken and reset to 9/28/23 at 10:00AM in Courtroom 1219. Emailed notice. (cdh, )
July 20, 2023 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Keshawn Freeman, Mario Froylan, James Hughes, Raynada Jones, Herbie McBride, Darcell Prince by Arthur R. Loevy (Loevy, Arthur)
July 20, 2023 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Keshawn Freeman, Mario Froylan, James Hughes, Raynada Jones, Herbie McBride, Darcell Prince by Maria Adel Makar (Makar, Maria)
July 20, 2023 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Keshawn Freeman, Mario Froylan, James Hughes, Raynada Jones, Herbie McBride, Darcell Prince by Stephen H. Weil (Weil, Stephen)
July 14, 2023 Filing 2 MINUTE entry before the Honorable LaShonda A. Hunt: This case has been assigned to the calendar of Judge LaShonda A. Hunt. The parties are ordered to file a Joint Initial Status Report for New Case by 8/24/23. A template for the report can be found on Judge Hunt's webpage on the Court's website under "New and Reassigned Cases." An in-person initial status hearing is set for 8/31/23, at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 1219. Emailed notice. (cdh, )
July 5, 2023 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable LaShonda A. Hunt. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert. Case assignment: Random assignment. (jb, )
July 5, 2023 CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (jb, )
June 30, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by James Hughes, Herbie McBride, Raynada Jones, Keshawn Freeman, Mario Froylan, Darcell Prince; JURY DEMAND. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AILNDC-20795202. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Weil, Stephen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Freeman et al v. Dawson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keshawn Freeman
Represented By: Arthur Loevy
Represented By: Maria Adel Makar
Represented By: Stephen H Weil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raynada Jones
Represented By: Arthur Loevy
Represented By: Maria Adel Makar
Represented By: Stephen H Weil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Herbie McBride
Represented By: Arthur Loevy
Represented By: Maria Adel Makar
Represented By: Stephen H Weil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mario Froylan
Represented By: Arthur Loevy
Represented By: Maria Adel Makar
Represented By: Stephen H Weil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darcell Prince
Represented By: Arthur Loevy
Represented By: Maria Adel Makar
Represented By: Stephen H Weil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Hughes
Represented By: Arthur Loevy
Represented By: Maria Adel Makar
Represented By: Stephen H Weil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Dawson
Represented By: Brian James Riordan
Represented By: Brian J Riordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cherryle Hinthorne
Represented By: Mark Loren Alanson
Represented By: James Robinson
Represented By: Paul O Watkiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wexford Health Services Inc
Represented By: Matthew H Weller
Represented By: Joseph J Lombardo
Represented By: Chad M Skarpiak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Precise Specialties Inc
Represented By: Brian James Riordan
Represented By: Brian J Riordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Illinois
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Wexford Employees
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Illinois Department of Corrections Employees
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?