Blakely v. Clearly Holdings, Inc.
Plaintiff: Alan Blakely
Defendant: Clearly Holdings, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2024cv01172
Filed: April 26, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Jonathan E Hawley
Referring Judge: James E Shadid
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 501 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 21, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 21, 2024 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #7 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Responsive Pleading. Responsive pleading in re #1 Complaint shall be filed by Clearly Holdings, Inc. by 7/24/2024. Entered by Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley on 6/21/24. (WG)
June 20, 2024 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Defendant Clearly Holdings, Inc.. Responses due by 7/5/2024 (Murphy, Joseph)
May 23, 2024 Filing 6 Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 Disclosure Statement by Clearly Holdings, Inc.. (Murphy, Joseph)
May 23, 2024 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #5 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Responsive pleading. Defendant Clearly Holdings, Inc. shall file their responsive pleading in re #1 Complaint on or before 6/24/2024. Entered by Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley on 5/23/24. (WG)
May 22, 2024 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, (Unopposed) by Defendant Clearly Holdings, Inc.. Responses due by 6/5/2024 (Murphy, Joseph)
May 22, 2024 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Joseph D Murphy on behalf of Clearly Holdings, Inc. (Murphy, Joseph)
May 10, 2024 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Alan Blakely. Clearly Holdings, Inc. served on 5/2/2024, answer due 5/23/2024. (Sanders, Craig)
April 26, 2024 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Clearly Holdings, Inc.(AEM)
April 26, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Clearly Holdings, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AILCDC-4460477.), filed by Alan Blakely. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Original Photographs, #2 Exhibit Infringing Uses of Photographs, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sanders, Craig)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blakely v. Clearly Holdings, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alan Blakely
Represented By: Craig B Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clearly Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph D Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?