VPR Internationale v Does 1-1017 Featured Case

Plaintiff: VPR Internationale
Defendant: Does 1-1017
Case Number: 2:2011cv02068
Filed: March 8, 2011
Court: Illinois Central District Court
Office: Urbana Office
County: XX Outside US
Presiding Judge: Harold A. Baker
Referring Judge: David G. Bernthal
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 29, 2011 15 Featured Case ORDER denying 14 Plaintiff's Motion to Certify the Court's 3/9/11 Order for Interlocutory Review entered by Judge Harold A. Baker on 4/29/11. See written Order. (KM, ilcd)
April 11, 2011 14 MOTION Certify Order by Plaintiff VPR Internationale. Responses due by 4/28/2011 (Steele, John)
March 9, 2011 10 Featured Case ORDER Entered by Judge Harold A. Baker on 3/9/11. Ex mero motu, in this case, the court directs the Clerk of the court to refuse to issue any subpoenas to plaintiff's counsel until further order of the court.(KW, ilcd)
March 8, 2011 1 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT against Does 1-1017 ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0753-1106890.), filed by VPR INTERNATIONALE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Steele, John) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/8/2011: # 2 Civil Cover Sheet) (KM, ilcd). Modified on 3/8/2011 (KM, ilcd).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: VPR Internationale v Does 1-1017
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VPR Internationale
Represented By: Jerald J Bonifield
Represented By: Jon E Rosenstengel
Represented By: John L Steele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-1017
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?