Shepard v. LifeStation et al
Plaintiff: Shepard and Dorothy Shepard
Defendant: LifeStation, Inc, Nortek Security and Control, Linear LLC and LifeStation Inc
Case Number: 2:2017cv02092
Filed: April 14, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Office: Urbana Office
County: Coles
Presiding Judge: Colin Stirling Bruce
Referring Judge: Eric I Long
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 18, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 1/18/18. See written Order. (TC, ilcd)
January 17, 2018 Filing 40 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Dorothy Shepard. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order of Dismissal)(Koebele, Jennifer)
December 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER FOLLOWING REPORT OF SETTLEMENT entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 12/11/17. The parties report the case is settled. All pending motions are terminated and pending deadlines are vacated. The parties to file a stipulation to dismiss within 35-days of this Order. See written Order. (Settlement Papers due by 1/16/18.) (TC, ilcd)
December 11, 2017 Filing 38 NOTICE of Settlement (Koebele, Jennifer)
October 27, 2017 Filing 37 ANSWER to #30 Amended Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by LifeStation Inc.(Jagadich, Adam)
October 25, 2017 Filing 36 ANSWER to #30 Amended Complaint by Nortek Security and Control.(Erickson, James)
October 25, 2017 Filing 35 MEMORANDUM in Support re #34 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings on Count I of Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint filed by Defendant LifeStation Inc. (Jagadich, Adam)
October 25, 2017 Filing 34 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings on Count I of Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by Defendant LifeStation Inc. Responses due by 11/8/2017 (Jagadich, Adam)
October 25, 2017 Filing 33 MEMORANDUM in Support re #32 MOTION to Dismiss Count III of Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint filed by Defendant LifeStation Inc. (Jagadich, Adam)
October 25, 2017 Filing 32 MOTION to Dismiss Count III of Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by Defendant LifeStation Inc. Responses due by 11/8/2017 (Jagadich, Adam)
October 11, 2017 Filing 31 CERTIFICATE of Service. (Koebele, Jennifer)
October 11, 2017 Filing 30 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Dorothy Shepard.(Koebele, Jennifer)
October 10, 2017 Filing 29 NOTICE of Change of Address by Adam J Jagadich (Jagadich, Adam)
October 5, 2017 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Judge Colin Stirling Bruce on 10/5/17. The court has reviewed Defendant LifeStation's #23 Motion to Reconsider. Defendant LifeStation's #23 Motion to Reconsider is hereby DENIED. (TC, ilcd)
October 2, 2017 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Daniel S Alexander on behalf of LifeStation Inc (Alexander, Daniel)
September 14, 2017 Minute Entry for proceedings held 9/4/17 before Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long. Appearance for Plaintiff by Jennifer Koebele. Appearance for Defendants by Matthew Kelly. Status Conference held by telephone. Status of case discussed. Amended Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting discussed; Court adopts plan and amends dates as follows: Amended Pleadings due by 11/27/17, Joinder of Parties due by 11/27/17. Further Status Conference set for 12/12/17 at 10:45 AM by telephone from Urbana (court will place call) before Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long. The status conference previously set for 10/3/17 is VACATED. (Tape #UR-B 10:51 AM.) (TC, ilcd)
September 13, 2017 Filing 27 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #23 MOTION for Reconsideration re Order on Motion to Dismiss, filed by Defendant Nortek Security and Control. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Agreement, #2 Exhibit Declaration)(Erickson, James)
September 13, 2017 Filing 26 RESPONSE to Motion re #23 MOTION for Reconsideration re Order on Motion to Dismiss, filed by Plaintiff Dorothy Shepard. (Koebele, Jennifer)
September 8, 2017 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 9/8/17. This Court has reviewed the parties' Amendment to the Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting #25 and pursuant to the Text Order scheduling this matter for a status conference by personal appearance on September 14, 2017 at 10:45 A.M., the matter is hereby converted from personal appearance to telephone conference on the same date at the same time. The Court will initiate the call. (TC, ilcd)
September 7, 2017 Filing 25 AMENDED DOCUMENT by LifeStation Inc. Amendment to #15 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting . (Kelly, Matthew)
August 30, 2017 Filing 24 MEMORANDUM in Support re #23 MOTION for Reconsideration re Order on Motion to Dismiss, filed by Defendant LifeStation Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiff's Complaint, #2 Exhibit June 14, 2017 Order, #3 Exhibit Daniel Oppenheim Declaration)(Kelly, Matthew)
August 30, 2017 Filing 23 MOTION for Reconsideration re Order on Motion to Dismiss, by Defendant LifeStation Inc. Responses due by 9/13/2017 (Kelly, Matthew)
August 14, 2017 Filing 22 CERTIFICATE Service of Nortek's Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosure. (Erickson, James)
August 11, 2017 Filing 21 CERTIFICATE of Compliance. (Koebele, Jennifer)
August 10, 2017 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 8/10/2017. Plaintiff's Motion for Status Hearing #20 is GRANTED. This matter is scheduled for a status conference by personal appearance before U.S. Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 9/14/17, at 10:45 A.M., Courtroom B, U.S. Courthouse, 201 South Vine Street, Urbana, Illinois. The parties shall develop a proposed discovery plan which shall be submitted to the Court not less than two days prior to the status conference. If an agreed discovery plan is filed seven days before the hearing, the conference will be AUTOMATICALLY converted to a telephone conference, and the Court will initiate the call. (KE, ilcd)
August 9, 2017 Filing 20 MOTION Status Hearing by Plaintiff Dorothy Shepard. Responses due by 8/23/2017 (Koebele, Jennifer)
July 31, 2017 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE OF INTEREST pursuant to Local Rule 11.3 by Nortek Security and Control. (Erickson, James)
July 20, 2017 Filing 18 MINUTES for proceedings held 7/20/2017 before Judge Eric I. Long. Appearance for Plaintiff by Jennifer Koebele. Appearance for Defendant by Adam Jagadich. Rule 16 conference held by telephone. Plan approved; dates set. Consent to magistrate judge discussed (form attached). ADR options offered, including court-hosted settlement conference. The following discovery deadlines are set: Initial disclosure due by 8/11/2017. Amended pleadings due by 9/27/2017. Joinder of parties due by 9/27/2017. Plaintiff's expert disclosure due by 2/15/2018. Plaintiff shall make experts available for deposition by 3/30/2018. Defendant's expert disclosure due by 5/15/2018. Defendant shall make experts available for deposition by 6/29/2018. Discovery, including deposition of experts, due by 7/31/2018. Case dispositive motions due by 9/14/2018. Final Pretrial Conference is scheduled for 1/11/2019 at 10:30 AM by personal appearance before Judge Colin S. Bruce, Courtroom A, Urbana. Jury Trial is scheduled for 1/22/2019 at 9:30 AM before Judge Colin S. Bruce, Courtroom A, Urbana (6-8 days). Status Hearing set before Judge Long on 10/3/2017 at 10:15 AM by telephone to discuss possible court hosted mediation or summary trial. (Tape #UR-B 10:30 AM.) (TC, ilcd)
July 14, 2017 Filing 17 ANSWER to Complaint AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES by Nortek Security and Control.(Erickson, James)
July 14, 2017 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by James Steven Erickson on behalf of Nortek Security and Control (Erickson, James)
July 14, 2017 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 7/14/17. This Court has reviewed the parties' Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting #15 and pursuant to the Order #12 scheduling this matter for a Rule 16 hearing conference by personal appearance on July 20, 2017 at 10:30 A.M., the matter is hereby converted from personal appearance to telephone conference on the same date at the same time. The Court will initiate the call. (TC, ilcd)
July 13, 2017 Filing 15 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by LifeStation Inc. (Kelly, Matthew)
June 28, 2017 Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES by LifeStation Inc.(Kelly, Matthew)
June 27, 2017 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Dorothy Shepard. Nortek Security and Control waiver sent on 5/19/2017, answer due 7/18/2017. (Koebele, Jennifer)
June 15, 2017 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Judge Colin Stirling Bruce on 6/14/17. Motion #11 is DENIED (per Text Order entered 6/14/17). (TC, ilcd)
June 14, 2017 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER Entered by Judge Colin Stirling Bruce on 6/14/17. The Motion to Dismiss #6 filed by Defendant LifeStation, Inc. is DENIED. This court concludes that, at this stage of the proceedings, Defendant has not shown that dismissal is warranted under 735 Ill. Comp. Stat. 5/2-621. Defendant's #11 Motion for Leave to File a Reply Memorandum is also DENIED. (SKR, ilcd)
June 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 6/12/2017. Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 7/20/2017 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom B in Urbana before Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long. See written order. (KE, ilcd)
June 2, 2017 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to File a Reply Memorandum by Defendant LifeStation Inc. Responses due by 6/16/2017 (Kelly, Matthew)
May 25, 2017 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #6 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Plaintiff Dorothy Shepard. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Recall Documents, #2 Exhibit Help Button Recall Notice)(Koebele, Jennifer)
May 25, 2017 Filing 9 RESPONSE to Motion re #6 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Plaintiff Dorothy Shepard. (Koebele, Jennifer)
May 19, 2017 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF SERVICE and Notice of Lawsuit sent to Nortek Security and Control a/k/a Linear, LLC, c/o Steve Erickson on May 19, 2017. (Koebele, Jennifer)
May 12, 2017 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT re #6 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by LifeStation Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Plaintiff's Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Declaration of Daniel Oppenheim)(Kelly, Matthew)
May 12, 2017 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by Defendant LifeStation Inc. Responses due by 5/26/2017 (Kelly, Matthew)
May 9, 2017 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 5/9/17. Defendant's Amended Notice of Removal #5 adequately alleges diversity jurisdiction. The Court's Order to Show Cause #3 is DISCHARGED. (TC, ilcd)
May 8, 2017 Filing 5 AMENDED DOCUMENT by LifeStation Inc. Amendment to #1 Notice of Removal,, AMENDED NOTICE OF REMOVAL. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EXHIBIT A, #2 Exhibit EXHIBIT B, #3 Exhibit EXHIBIT C, #4 Exhibit EXHIBIT D, #5 Exhibit EXHIBIT E, #6 Exhibit EXHIBIT F, #7 Exhibit EXHIBIT G, #8 Exhibit EXHIBIT H, #9 Exhibit EXHIBIT I)(Kelly, Matthew) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/8/2017: #10 Exhibit) (TC, ilcd).
May 1, 2017 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Adam J Jagadich on behalf of LifeStation Inc (Jagadich, Adam)
April 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 4/17/17. Defendant is ordered to show cause as to why this matter should not be dismissed for want of jurisdiction within 21 days from the entry of this order. See written Order. (Show Cause response due by 5/8/17.) (TC, ilcd)
April 14, 2017 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Matthew Douglas Kelly on behalf of LifeStation, Inc. (Kelly, Matthew)
April 14, 2017 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Charleston, Coles County, Illinois, case number 2017 L 17 (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0753-2553158), filed by LifeStation, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G Notice of Service Process, #8 Exhibit H)(Kelly, Matthew) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/17/2017: #9 Civil Cover Sheet) (TC, ilcd). Modified on 4/17/2017 to identify complaint, etc. (TC, ilcd).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shepard v. LifeStation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shepard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dorothy Shepard
Represented By: Jennifer Ann Koebele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LifeStation, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nortek Security and Control
Represented By: James Steven Erickson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linear LLC
Represented By: James Steven Erickson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LifeStation Inc
Represented By: Matthew Douglas Kelly
Represented By: Daniel S Alexander
Represented By: Adam J Jagadich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?