Lavender v. Driveline Retail Merchandising Inc
Plaintiff: Shirley Lavender
Defendant: Driveline Retail Merchandising Inc
Case Number: 2:2018cv02097
Filed: April 2, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Office: Urbana Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Colin Stirling Bruce
Presiding Judge: Eric I. Long
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 81 OPINION entered by U.S. Magistrate Judge Tom Schanzle-Haskins on 10/14/2020. Plaintiff Lynn McGlenn's Objection to Defendant's Notice of Issuance of Subpoena in a Civil Case 79 is DENIED for lack of standing. See written order. (LB, ilcd)
April 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 64 OPINION entered by U.S. Magistrate Judge Tom Schanzle-Haskins. Defendant Driveline Retail Merchandising, Inc.'s Motion to Compel Plaintiff Lynn McGlenn to Respond to Discovery 55 is ALLOWED in part and DENIED in part. See written order. (LB, ilcd)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 43 OPINION: Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Substitute Class Representative and for Leave to File an Amended Class Action Complaint in Accordance with the Substitution (d/e 34 ) is GRANTED. Plaintiff shall file the Amended Class Action Complaint on or before September 11, 2019. The pending Motion for Class Certification (d/e 17 ) is DENIED AS MOOT with leave to refile. This matter is referred to Magistrate Judge Tom Schanzle-Haskins for the entry of a new scheduling order and to address the issues Defendant raised about expert reports and additional interrogatories. (SEE WRITTEN OPINION.) Entered by Judge Sue E. Myerscough on 9/6/2019. (GL, ilcd)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lavender v. Driveline Retail Merchandising Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shirley Lavender
Represented By: Marisa Glassman
Represented By: Kevin Hannon
Represented By: Jean S Martin
Represented By: Shannon McNulty
Represented By: John A Yanchunis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Driveline Retail Merchandising Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?