Nelson v. United States of America et al
Plaintiff: Katherine Nelson
Defendant: Tarunkumar Patel, Dennis Lockrey, Danville VA Medical Center, United States of America and . Shapiro
Case Number: 2:2018cv02183
Filed: July 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Office: Urbana Office
County: Champaign
Presiding Judge: Colin Stirling Bruce
Referring Judge: Eric I Long
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1402
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 5, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 5, 2018 Filing 13 Case transferred in from District of Illinois Northern; Case Number 1:18-cv-00653. .
July 5, 2018 Filing 12 TRANSFERRED to the USDC for the Central District of Illinois the electronic record. (kp, )
July 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: Status hearing held. Only counsel for Plaintiff appeared. Pursuant to the discussion held in open court, Plaintiff's oral motion to transfer this action pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404 to the Central District of Illinois, because all of the actions at issue took place in that district, is granted. The Clerk is directed to transfer this case to the United States District Court for the Central District of Illinois forthwith. All pending deadlines and hearing dates in this District are stricken. The time for defendant to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint and all other case deadlines shall be set by the transferee court. Civil Case terminated. Signed by the Honorable Andrea R. Wood on 7/3/2018. Mailed notice. (kp, )
May 24, 2018 Filing 10 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Status hearing held. Only counsel for Plaintiff appeared. Pursuant to the discussion held in open court, the status hearing is continued. The status hearing set on the record is stricken and reset for 7/3/2018 at 9:00 AM. Mailed notice (ef, )
May 23, 2018 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Katherine Nelson as to Danville VA Medical Center on 4/13/2018, answer due 5/4/2018. (Montgomery, Robert)
May 23, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Katherine Nelson as to Dennis Lockrey on 4/13/2018, answer due 5/4/2018. (Montgomery, Robert)
May 23, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Katherine Nelson as to Dr. Shapiro on 4/13/2018, answer due 5/4/2018. (Montgomery, Robert)
May 23, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Katherine Nelson as to Tarunkumar Patel on 4/13/2018, answer due 5/4/2018. (Montgomery, Robert)
April 12, 2018 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Danville VA Medical Center, Dennis Lockrey, Tarunkumar Patel, Dr. Shapiro. (kms)
April 11, 2018 Filing 5 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Status hearing held. Only counsel for Plaintiff appeared. Pursuant to the discussion held in open court, Plaintiff's deadline to effect service of summons and complaint on Defendant is extended to the next status hearing. Status hearing set for 5/24/2018 at 9:00 AM. Mailed notice (ef, )
February 5, 2018 Filing 4 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Initial status hearing set for 4/11/2018 at 9:00 AM. The parties are directed to meet and conduct a planning conference pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f). At least seven days before the initial status hearing, the parties shall file a joint written status report, not to exceed five pages in length. The initial status report shall provide the information described on the Court's website at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under District Judges, Judge Andrea R. Wood, Initial Status Conference. Mailed notice (ef, )
February 2, 2018 Filing 3 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Attachments: #1 Appearance)(Montgomery, Robert)
February 1, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes the MIDP Standing Order. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (kp, )
January 29, 2018 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Andrea R. Wood. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert. (meg, )
January 29, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Derrick Nelson; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-14059981.(Montgomery, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nelson v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tarunkumar Patel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis Lockrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Danville VA Medical Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: . Shapiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katherine Nelson
Represented By: Robert A Montgomery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?