United States of America v. Moore
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Brandy Moore
Case Number: 2:2018cv02216
Filed: August 15, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Office: Urbana Office
County: Piatt
Presiding Judge: Colin Stirling Bruce
Referring Judge: Eric I Long
2 Judge: James E Shadid
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery Student Loan
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 19, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 19, 2018 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by United States of America. Brandy Moore waiver sent on 8/20/2018, answer due 10/19/2018. (Noll, Gail)
August 23, 2018 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER REASSIGNING CASE: This case reassigned to Chief Judge James E. Shadid for further proceedings. All dates to remain as previously scheduled. Entered by Chief Judge James E. Shadid on 8/23/2018. (MC, ilcd)
August 20, 2018 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF SERVICE and Notice of Lawsuit sent to Brandy Moore on August 20, 2018. (Noll, Gail)
August 15, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Brandy Moore, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(KE, ilcd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brandy Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Gail Linn Noll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?