Minerva Sportswear Inc v. First to the Finish Kim and Mike Viano Sports Inc et al
Plaintiff: Minerva Sportswear Inc
Defendant: Mike J Viano, Kirby Johnson, KCJ Consulting Inc, Kim Viano, First to the Finish Kim and Mike Viano Sports Inc and Positively 4th Street Records
Case Number: 2:2019cv02034
Filed: February 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Colin Stirling Bruce
Referring Judge: Eric I Long
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 8, 2019 Filing 25 MEMORANDUM In Support of re #24 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by First to the Finish Kim and Mike Viano Sports Inc, Kim Viano, Mike J Viano. (Klaus, Richard)
April 8, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants First to the Finish Kim and Mike Viano Sports Inc, Kim Viano, Mike J Viano. Responses due by 4/22/2019 (Klaus, Richard)
April 5, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION for Leave to File Reply in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Complaint (Doc. #16) by Defendants Kirby Johnson, KCJ Consulting Inc, Positively 4th Street Records. Responses due by 4/19/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Flygare, Garth)
March 22, 2019 Filing 22 RESPONSE to Motion re #16 MOTION to Dismiss filed by KCJ Defendants filed by Plaintiff Minerva Sportswear Inc. (TeBeest, Seth)
March 19, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Garth Eachan Flygare on behalf of Kirby Johnson, KCJ Consulting Inc, Positively 4th Street Records (Flygare, Garth)
March 19, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 3/19/19. The FTTF Defendants' Motion for an Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading #15 is GRANTED over Plaintiff's objection. The FTTF Defendants' deadline to file a responsive pleading is extended to April 8, 2019. Additionally, pursuant to the filing of Defendants KCJ and Johnson's Motion to Dismiss #16 , their Motion for Extension to File Answer or Other Responsive Pleading #12 is DENIED as moot. (TC, ilcd)
March 15, 2019 Filing 20 OBJECTION to FTTF Defendants' to #15 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Minerva Sportswear Inc. (Hefflefinger, Matthew)
March 13, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Tyler J Pratt on behalf of Minerva Sportswear Inc (Pratt, Tyler)
March 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 3/11/2019. Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 5/1/2019 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom B in Urbana before Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long. See written order. (JMB, ilcd)
March 8, 2019 Filing 17 MEMORANDUM re #16 MOTION to Dismiss by Kirby Johnson, KCJ Consulting Inc, Positively 4th Street Records. (Hocking, R)
March 8, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendants Kirby Johnson, KCJ Consulting Inc, Positively 4th Street Records. Responses due by 3/22/2019 (Hocking, R)
March 8, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Defendants First to the Finish Kim and Mike Viano Sports Inc, Kim Viano, Mike J Viano. Responses due by 3/22/2019 (Klaus, Richard)
March 8, 2019 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF INTEREST pursuant to Local Rule 11.3 by First to the Finish Kim and Mike Viano Sports Inc, Kim Viano, Mike J Viano. (Klaus, Richard)
March 8, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Richard P Klaus on behalf of First to the Finish Kim and Mike Viano Sports Inc, Kim Viano, Mike J Viano (Klaus, Richard)
March 6, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Other Responsive Pleading by Defendants Kirby Johnson, KCJ Consulting Inc, Positively 4th Street Records. Responses due by 3/20/2019 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order on Motion for Extension)(Hocking, R)
March 6, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF INTEREST pursuant to Local Rule 11.3 by Kirby Johnson, KCJ Consulting Inc, Positively 4th Street Records. (Hocking, R)
March 6, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by R Sean Hocking on behalf of Kirby Johnson, KCJ Consulting Inc, Positively 4th Street Records (Hocking, R)
February 21, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Minerva Sportswear Inc. Kirby Johnson served on 2/15/2019, answer due 3/8/2019. (TeBeest, Seth)
February 21, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Minerva Sportswear Inc. KCJ Consulting Inc served on 2/15/2019, answer due 3/8/2019. (TeBeest, Seth)
February 21, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Minerva Sportswear Inc. Positively 4th Street Records served on 2/15/2019, answer due 3/8/2019. (TeBeest, Seth)
February 21, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Minerva Sportswear Inc. Kim Viano served on 2/15/2019, answer due 3/8/2019. (TeBeest, Seth)
February 21, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Minerva Sportswear Inc. Mike J Viano served on 2/15/2019, answer due 3/8/2019. (TeBeest, Seth)
February 21, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Minerva Sportswear Inc. First to the Finish Kim and Mike Viano Sports Inc served on 2/15/2019, answer due 3/8/2019. (TeBeest, Seth)
February 11, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to First to the Finish Kim and Mike Viano Sports Inc, Mike J Viano, Kim Viano, Positively 4th Street Records, KCJ Consulting Inc, Kirby Johnson. (Original summonses mailed to plaintiff's counsel for service.) (KM, ilcd)
February 11, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTEREST pursuant to Local Rule 11.3 by Minerva Sportswear, Inc.. (TeBeest, Seth)
February 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against First to the Finish Kim and Mike Viano Sports, Inc., KCJ Consulting, Inc. d/b/a Gavina Graphics, Positively 4th Street Records, Kim Viano, Mike J Viano ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0753-3033937.), filed by Minerva Sportswear, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(TeBeest, Seth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Minerva Sportswear Inc v. First to the Finish Kim and Mike Viano Sports Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike J Viano
Represented By: Richard P Klaus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kirby Johnson
Represented By: R Sean Hocking
Represented By: Garth Eachan Flygare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KCJ Consulting Inc
Represented By: R Sean Hocking
Represented By: Garth Eachan Flygare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kim Viano
Represented By: Richard P Klaus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First to the Finish Kim and Mike Viano Sports Inc
Represented By: Richard P Klaus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Positively 4th Street Records
Represented By: R Sean Hocking
Represented By: Garth Eachan Flygare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Minerva Sportswear Inc
Represented By: Matthew S Hefflefinger
Represented By: Seth Andrew TeBeest
Represented By: Tyler J Pratt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?