Wells v. Brookhart
Petitioner: Stephen Wells
Respondent: Deanna Brookhart
Undetermined: Habeas Attorney General
Case Number: 2:2019cv02057
Filed: March 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Colin Stirling Bruce
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 25, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Richard Joseph Cook on behalf of Deanna Brookhart (Cook, Richard)
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER entered by Judge Colin Stirling Bruce on 3/18/19. Respondent, Deanna Brookheart, has sixty (60) days to file a response to the Petition pursuant to Rule 5 of the Rules Governing Section 2254 Cases in the United States District Courts (Responses due by 5/17/2019). SEE WRITTEN ORDER. (KM, ilcd)
March 18, 2019 Filing fee: $5.00 paid; receipt number 24626008543. (DS, ilcd)
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 TEXT ORDER entered by Judge Colin Stirling Bruce on 3/6/19 directing the Petitioner to pay the filing fee of $5.00 within 30 days of this Order. If Petitioner is unable to pay the required filing fee, he may file a Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis (attached). If Petitioner fails to pay the required filing fee or file a Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis within 30 days, his Petition under 28 U.S.C. 2254 for Writ of Habeas Corpus by a person in State Custody #1 will be dismissed without prejudice by this court. (Miscellaneous Deadline 4/5/2019.) (KM, ilcd)
March 6, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Stephen Wells.(KM, ilcd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wells v. Brookhart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Stephen Wells
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Deanna Brookhart
Represented By: Richard Joseph Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: Habeas Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?