Hemingway v. Dorethy
Petitioner: Kevin Hemingway
Respondent: Stephanie Dorethy
Not Yet Classified: Habeas Attorney General
Case Number: 2:2019cv02065
Filed: March 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Colin Stirling Bruce
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Stay Case in Abeyance by Petitioner Kevin Hemingway. Responses due by 7/22/2019. (DS, ilcd)
June 25, 2019 Filing 7 State Court Record Received.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q (part 1), #18 Exhibit Q (part 2), #19 Exhibit R)(Barbat, Rachel)
June 25, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint (petition for a writ of habeas corpus) by Stephanie Dorethy.(Barbat, Rachel)
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Judge Colin Stirling Bruce on 5/23/2019. Respondent's Motion for Extension of Time to File Response #5 is GRANTED. The Response is now due on or before 6/25/2019. (KE, ilcd)
May 20, 2019 Filing 5 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to habeas corpus petition by Respondent Stephanie Dorethy. Responses due by 6/3/2019 (Barbat, Rachel)
March 29, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Rachel Lynn Barbat on behalf of Stephanie Dorethy (Barbat, Rachel)
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER entered by Judge Colin Stirling Bruce on 3/26/2019. Petitioner's Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis #2 is DENIED. Respondent shall, within 60 days, answer the #1 Petition. See written Order. (Responses due by 5/25/2019) (DS, ilcd)
March 18, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Petitioner Kevin Hemingway. Responses due by 4/1/2019. (DS, ilcd)
March 18, 2019 Filing fee: $5.00 paid; receipt number 24626008548. (DS, ilcd)
March 18, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Kevin Hemingway. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Envelope)(DS, ilcd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hemingway v. Dorethy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Habeas Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Stephanie Dorethy
Represented By: Rachel Lynn Barbat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Kevin Hemingway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?