Pettigrew v. University of Illinois
Plaintiff: Nancy C Pettigrew
Defendant: University of Illinois
Case Number: 2:2019cv02087
Filed: April 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Colin Stirling Bruce
Referring Judge: Eric I Long
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 6/27/2019. Defendant's Agreed Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive pleading #13 is GRANTED. Defendant's deadline to file its response to Plaintiff's Complaint is extended to 7/11/19. (University of Illinois answer due 7/11/2019) (DS, ilcd)
June 27, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint (Agreed) by Defendant University of Illinois. Responses due by 7/11/2019 (Smith, Brian)
June 24, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by James M Kelly on behalf of Nancy C Pettigrew (Kelly, James)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 6/6/2019. Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 7/24/2019 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom B in Urbana before Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long. See written order. (JMB, ilcd)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 6/6/2019. Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading #10 is GRANTED. Defendant's deadline to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is extended to 6/27/19.(JMB, ilcd)
June 5, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Defendant University of Illinois. Responses due by 6/19/2019 (Smith, Brian)
June 5, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Bryan Jeffrey Vayr on behalf of University of Illinois (Vayr, Bryan)
June 5, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Brian Michael Smith on behalf of University of Illinois (Smith, Brian)
May 17, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Nancy C Pettigrew. University of Illinois served on 5/16/2019, answer due 6/6/2019. (JMB, ilcd)
April 10, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to University of Illinois and mailed to the US Marshal for service. (JMB, ilcd)
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 4/10/2019. Plaintiff's Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees #2 is GRANTED. See written order. (JMB, ilcd)
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 4/10/2019. For the reasons stated in the order, Plaintiff's Motion to Request Counsel #3 is DENIED. See written order. (JMB, ilcd)
April 9, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Request Counsel by Plaintiff Nancy C Pettigrew. Responses due by 4/23/2019 (JMB, ilcd)
April 9, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Nancy C Pettigrew. Responses due by 4/23/2019 (Attachments: #1 Summons/USM 285)(JMB, ilcd)
April 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Nancy C Pettigrew, filed by Nancy C Pettigrew. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(JMB, ilcd) (Main Document 1 replaced on 4/9/2019) (JMB, ilcd).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pettigrew v. University of Illinois
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy C Pettigrew
Represented By: James M Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: University of Illinois
Represented By: Bryan Jeffrey Vayr
Represented By: Brian Michael Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?