Cole v. Riverside Hospital
Plaintiff: Tyshawn Cole
Defendant: Riverside Hospital
Case Number: 2:2019cv02121
Filed: May 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Colin Stirling Bruce
Referring Judge: Eric I Long
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 42:1986
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER Entered by Judge Colin Stirling Bruce on 5/28/19. Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint #7 is DENIED. Although a district court should "allow ample opportunity for amending the complaint when it appears that by doing so the pro se litigant would be able to state a meritorious claim," it need not do so if nothing suggests that the plaintiff would be able to state a meritorious claim. Mast v. Chase, 2013 WL 1785520 (N.D. Ind. April 25, 2013) (citing Marshall v. Knight, 445 F.3d 965, 970 (7th Cir. 2006). Plaintiffs proposed amended complaint consists of a form Section 1983 pleading that is devoid of factual allegations. It does not comply with the minimal pleading requirements set forth in Rule 8(a). It fails to suggest that Plaintiff would be able to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. (SKR, ilcd)
May 24, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by Plaintiff Tyshawn Cole. Responses due by 6/7/2019 (JMB, ilcd)
May 8, 2019 Filing 6 JUDGMENT entered (SKR, ilcd)
May 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER DISMISSING CASE Entered by Judge Colin Stirling Bruce on 5/8/19. Plaintiff's Complaint does not comply with the minimal pleading requirements set forth in Rule 8(a) and fails to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. Plaintiff's Complaint is dismissed under Section 1915(e). This case is closed. SEE WRITTEN ORDER. (SKR, ilcd)
May 6, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Request Counsel by Plaintiff Tyshawn Cole. Responses due by 5/20/2019 (SKR, ilcd)
May 6, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Tyshawn Cole. Responses due by 5/20/2019 (SKR, ilcd)
May 6, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE regarding privacy (SKR, ilcd)
May 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Riverside Hospital filed by Tyshawn Cole. (Attachments: #1 envelope)(SKR, ilcd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cole v. Riverside Hospital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Riverside Hospital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyshawn Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?