Kowalski v. Bukowski
Petitioner: Robert M Kowalski
Respondent: Timothy Bukowski and Chad Kolitwenzew
Interested Party: United States of America
Case Number: 2:2019cv02124
Filed: May 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Sara Darrow
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 6, 2019 Filing 3 JUDGMENT entered. (KB, ilcd)
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER Entered by Chief Judge Sara Darrow on 5/21/2019. For these reasons, the Court finds Petitioner Robert M. Kowalski's Petition #1 must be DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for failure to exhaust his direct appeals. Additionally, the Clerk is DIRECTED to add Chad Kolitwenzew and terminate Timothy Bukowski as Respondent in this case. The United States is named as Interested Party. This case is CLOSED. (KB, ilcd) Modified on 5/24/2019 to reflect add/term parties (ED, ilcd).
May 15, 2019 Filing fee: $ 5.00, receipt number 24626008677 (JMB, ilcd)
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER: Entered by Chief Judge Sara Darrow on 5/9/2019. Petitioner has filed a Petition for Habeas Corpus Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2241. Petitioner is directed to either pay the $5 filing fee or provide the Court with a signed Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs that also includes a copy of his trust fund ledger, certified by the appropriate institutional officer, showing all receipts, expenditures and balances for the last six months. Petitioner shall do so on or before June 7, 2019, or the Court will dismiss the case without prejudice for failure to pay the filing fee. (LN, ilcd)
May 8, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241) filed by Robert M Kowalski. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Envelope)(KM, ilcd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kowalski v. Bukowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Timothy Bukowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Chad Kolitwenzew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Robert M Kowalski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: United States of America
Represented By: Greggory R Walters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?