Hubert v. Ford Motor Company
Plaintiff: Ryan Hubert
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv02125
Filed: May 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Colin Stirling Bruce
Referring Judge: Eric I Long
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 6/20/2019. Defendant's Motion to Stay #6 is GRANTED. This case is stayed until further order. The Court directs Defendant to update the parties on the status of this case on or before 8/19/19. (Status Report due by 8/19/2019.)(DS, ilcd)
June 20, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Stay Litigation by Defendant Ford Motor Company. Responses due by 7/5/2019 (Boyle, Mark)
June 20, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Mark Boyle on behalf of Ford Motor Company (Boyle, Mark)
May 28, 2019 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Joel A. Dewey for Ford Motor Company in MDL #2901. (DS, ilcd) Modified on 5/30/2019 (KM, ilcd).
May 28, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance re Rule 4.1(c) in MDL #2901 by Attorney Joel A. Dewey on behalf of Ford Motor Company . (DS, ilcd) Modified on 5/30/2019 to include attorney name (KM, ilcd).
May 9, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTEREST pursuant to Local Rule 11.3 by Ryan Hubert. (Brown, Joel)
May 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Class Action Complaint against Ford Motor Company ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0753-3101617.), filed by Ryan Hubert.(Brown, Joel) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/9/2019: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (KM, ilcd).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hubert v. Ford Motor Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Represented By: Mark Boyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan Hubert
Represented By: Joel E Brown
Represented By: Adam J Levitt
Represented By: Sharon S Almonrode
Represented By: Matthew D Schelkopf
Represented By: Joseph G Sauder
Represented By: John Tangren
Represented By: William Kalas
Represented By: Joseph B Kenney
Represented By: Adam Prom
Represented By: E Powell Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?