Wade v. Lawrence
Petitioner: Jerrell W Wade
Respondent: Frank Lawrence
Not Yet Classified: Habeas Attorney General
Case Number: 2:2019cv02135
Filed: May 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Colin Stirling Bruce
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 14, 2019 Filing 5 +++ PRISONER TRUST FUND LEDGER. by Jerrell W Wade. (DS, ilcd)
June 14, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Petitioner Jerrell W Wade. Responses due by 6/28/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(DS, ilcd)
June 10, 2019 Filing fee: $5, receipt number 24626008737. (TC, ilcd)
June 5, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Petition and Withdraw Stay & Abeyence by Petitioner Jerrell W Wade. Responses due by 6/19/2019. (DS, ilcd)
May 24, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Petitioner Jerrell W Wade. Responses due by 6/7/2019. (KM, ilcd)
May 24, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Jerrell W Wade. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3) (KM, ilcd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wade v. Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Habeas Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jerrell W Wade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Frank Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?