Morgan et al v. Williams et al
Plaintiff: William Morgan and Paul Farrow, Jr
Defendant: Shayne Cassidy, Dennis Gardner, Michael Maria, . Austenverg, City of Danville, Jaqueline Lacy, JB Pritzer, County of Vermilion Illinois, Pat Hartshorn, . Salazar, Judge Unknown, Rickey Williams, John Doe and Nancy Fahey
Case Number: 2:2019cv02143
Filed: May 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Colin Stirling Bruce
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 25, 2019 Filing 33 Letter from Paul Farrow to Judge Shadid regarding Judge Baker. (Also filed in case 19-2109.) (KM, ilcd)
July 24, 2019 Filing 32 PLRA FEE NOTICE & ORDER of USCA as to #25 Notice of Appeal filed by William Morgan, Paul Farrow, Jr. (DS, ilcd)
July 24, 2019 Filing 31 NOTICE of Docketing Record on Appeal from USCA re #25 Notice of Appeal filed by William Morgan, Paul Farrow, Jr. USCA Case Number 19-2383. (DS, ilcd)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Judge Harold A. Baker on 7/23/2019. Plaintiffs have filed a motion for leave to appeal in forma pauperis. Title 28 U.S.C. Sec 1915(a)(3) provides that "an appeal may not be taken in forma pauperis if the trial court certifies in writing that it is not taken in good faith." Id. An appeal taken in "good faith" is not about the movant's sincerity or motivation. A good faith appeal is an appeal that "a reasonable person could suppose... has some merit." Walker v. O'Brien, 216 F.3d 626, 632 (7th Cir. 2000). The Court has reviewed Plaintiffs' motion, their notice of appeal, and the Court's Orders, and the Court does not see an arguable good faith basis for their appeal. Accordingly, the Court certifies pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Sec 1915(a)(3) that Plaintiffs' petition to appeal in forma pauperis is not in good faith, and the motion #26 is DENIED. If Plaintiffs wish to contest this Court's finding, they must renew their petition to proceed in forma pauperis with the Court of Appeals within thirty (30) days after service of this Order. Fed. R. App. P. 24(a). The Clerk of the Court is directed to send a copy of this Order to the Seventh Circuit Court of Appeals. (KE, ilcd)
July 22, 2019 Filing 30 Letter from Paul Farrow to Judge Shadid (JRK, ilcd)
July 22, 2019 Filing 29 Short Record of Appeal Sent to US Court of Appeals re #25 Notice of Appeal. (DS, ilcd)
July 22, 2019 Filing 28 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #26 MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis by Plaintiff William Morgan. (DS, ilcd)
July 22, 2019 Filing 27 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #26 MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Paul Farrow, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(DS, ilcd)
July 22, 2019 Filing 26 MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis by Plaintiffs Paul Farrow, Jr, William Morgan. Responses due by 8/5/2019. (DS, ilcd)
July 22, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #19 Merit Review Order by Paul Farrow, Jr, William Morgan. (Attachments: #1 Letter, #2 Envelope)(DS, ilcd)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER entered by Judge Harold A. Baker on 7/16/2019. Plaintiffs' motion regarding writ #21 is DENIED. Plaintiffs' motion to reconsider #23 is DENIED. See written order. (KE, ilcd)
July 3, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION for Reconsideration re #19 Merit Review Opinion, #20 Judgment by Plaintiff Paul Farrow, Jr. Responses due by 7/17/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(DS, ilcd)
June 28, 2019 Filing 22 Exhibit to Request for Counsel by Paul Farrow, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (KM, ilcd)
June 28, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION by Plaintiff Paul Farrow, Jr. Responses due by 7/12/2019 (RL, ilcd)
June 27, 2019 Filing 20 JUDGMENT entered. (KE, ilcd)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MERIT REVIEW ORDER entered by Judge Harold A. Baker on 6/27/2019. The plaintiffs' complaint is dismissed for failure to state a claim pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. Proc. 12(b)(6) and 28 U.S.C. Section 1915A. Any amendment to the Complaint would be futile because the alleged facts will not support the referenced federal claims. This case is therefore closed. The clerk is directed to enter a judgment pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 58. This case is closed. This dismissal shall count as one of the plaintiffs' three allotted strikes pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1915(g). The clerk of the court is directed to record a strike in the three-strike log for both Plaintiff Morgan and Plaintiff Farrow. The plaintiffs must still pay the full docketing fee of $350 even though their case has been dismissed. The agency having custody of the plaintiffs shall continue to make monthly payments to the Clerk of Court, as directed in the Court's prior order. See written order.(KE, ilcd)
June 26, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION for Reconsideration re Text Order on Motion to Request Counsel, by Plaintiff Paul Farrow, Jr. Responses due by 7/10/2019. (DS, ilcd)
June 25, 2019 Filing 17 PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 6/25/2019 2:40:25 PM ]. File Size [ 1865 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:03:53 ]. (admin).
June 25, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held 6/25/19 before Judge Harold A. Baker. Appearance by Plaintiffs William Morgan and Paul Farrow, Jr. Merit Review hearing held by telephone. Allegations of the Complaint discussed. For the reasons stated on the record Plaintiff Farrow's Motion to Continue Merit Review Hearing and to Substitute Judge #16 is DENIED. Written Order to be entered. (Tape #UR-C 2:40 PM.) (TC, ilcd)
June 24, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION to Continue Merit Review Hearing & Substitute Judge by Plaintiff Paul Farrow, Jr. Responses due by 7/8/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Cover Letter)(DS, ilcd)
June 24, 2019 Filing 15 Letter from Plaintiff regarding counsel. (DS, ilcd)
June 24, 2019 Filing 14 Letter from Plaintiff requesting docket sheets in cases 11-2218 & 09-2068. (copies of dockets sheets for both cases mailed to plaintiff in self addressed envelope) (DS, ilcd)
June 19, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by Plaintiff Paul Farrow, Jr. Responses due by 7/3/2019 (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Proposed Amendments, #3 Proposed Order) (KM, ilcd)
June 14, 2019 Filing 12 TELEPHONE WRIT issued for both plaintiffs for Merit Review Hearing on 6/25/2019. (copy mailed to Records at Vermilion County PSB) (DS, ilcd) (Main Document 12 replaced on 6/14/2019) (DS, ilcd).
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Judge Harold A. Baker on 6/14/2019. A merit review hearing is set for June 25, 2019, at 2:20 p.m., by telephone conference call from Urbana. The clerk is directed to issue a writ to insure plaintiff's appearance at this merit review hearing. (DS, ilcd)
June 12, 2019 Filing 11 Exhibit re #7 Motion to Request Counsel by Paul Farrow, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit). (KM, ilcd)
June 10, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction & Temporary Restraining Order by Plaintiff Paul Farrow, Jr. Responses due by 6/24/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Letter)(DS, ilcd)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Judge Colin Stirling Bruce on 6/10/2019. Plaintiffs' motion to request counsel #7 is DENIED. The Court generally will not consider recruiting counsel for a pro se plaintiff until the Court determines that he possess a claim upon which relief can be granted after conducting a merit review of the complaint. Plaintiffs may renew their motion if their claim survives a merit review that the Court will conduct in the near future. (DS, ilcd)
June 6, 2019 Filing 9 +++ PRISONER TRUST FUND LEDGER. by Paul Farrow, Jr. (DS, ilcd)
June 6, 2019 Filing 8 +++ PRISONER TRUST FUND LEDGER. by William Morgan. (DS, ilcd)
June 6, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Request Counsel by Plaintiff Paul Farrow, Jr. Responses due by 6/20/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Letter)(DS, ilcd) Modified on 6/12/2019 Exhibit #11 filed (KM, ilcd).
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Judge Colin Stirling Bruce on 6/6/2019. Plaintiff William Morgan's #4 Petition to Proceed In Forma Pauperis is GRANTED. Plaintiff`s trust fund ledgers indicate he has no funds to make an initial partial payment of the filing fee. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1915(b)(4), the initial partial filing fee is waived. The agency having custody of Plaintiff is directed to make monthly payments of 20 percent of the preceding month's income credited to Plaintiff`s account to the Clerk of Court. Income includes all deposits from any source. The agency having custody of the plaintiff shall forward these payments each time Plaintiff's account exceeds $10, until the filing fee of $350 is paid in full. The Clerk is directed to mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff`s place of confinement, to the attention of the Trust Fund Office. (DS, ilcd) Modified on 6/7/2019 as to plaintiff William Morgan ( (KM, ilcd).
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Judge Colin Stirling Bruce on 6/6/2019. Plaintiff Paul Farrow, Jr's #3 Petition to Proceed In Forma Pauperis is GRANTED. Plaintiff`s trust fund ledgers indicate he has no funds to make an initial partial payment of the filing fee. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1915(b)(4), the initial partial filing fee is waived. The agency having custody of Plaintiff is directed to make monthly payments of 20 percent of the preceding month`s income credited to Plaintiff`s account to the Clerk of Court. Income includes all deposits from any source. The agency having custody of the plaintiff shall forward these payments each time Plaintiff`s account exceeds $10, until the filing fee of $350 is paid in full. The Clerk is directed to mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff`s place of confinement, to the attention of the Trust Fund Office. (DS, ilcd) Modified on 6/7/2019 as to plaintiff Paul Farrow, Jr (KM, ilcd).
May 30, 2019 Filing 6 Letter from the Clerk of the Court to the Trust Fund Department at Vermilion County Public Safety Bldg as to William Morgan. (DS, ilcd)
May 30, 2019 Filing 5 Letter from the Clerk of the Court to the Trust Fund Department at Vermilion County Public Safety Bldg as to Plaintiff Paul Farrow, Jr. (DS, ilcd)
May 30, 2019 Filing 4 PETITION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, filed by William Morgan.(DS, ilcd)
May 30, 2019 Filing 3 PETITION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, filed by Paul Farrow, Jr.(DS, ilcd)
May 30, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF CASE OPENING. Please be advised that your case has been assigned to Judge Colin Stirling Bruce. Effective immediately, all documents should be mailed or scanned to the Urbana Division, 201 S Vine Street, Urbana, IL 61802.Merit Review Deadline set for 6/19/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice Regarding Privacy Issues)(DS, ilcd)
May 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against. Austenverg, Shayne Cassidy, City of Danville, County of Vermilion Illinois, John Doe, Nancy Fahey, Dennis Gardner, Pat Hartshorn, Jaqueline Lacy, Michael Maria, JB Pritzer,. Salazar, Judge Unknown, Rickey Williams, filed by Paul Farrow, Jr, William Morgan. (Attachments: #1 Envelope, #2 Letter)(DS, ilcd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Morgan et al v. Williams et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shayne Cassidy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Maria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: . Austenverg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Danville
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jaqueline Lacy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JB Pritzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Vermilion Illinois
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pat Hartshorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: . Salazar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judge Unknown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rickey Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy Fahey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Farrow, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?