Whitefield v. USA
Petitioner: William L Whitefield
Respondent: USA
Case Number: 2:2019cv02206
Filed: July 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: James E Shadid
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 14, 2019 Filing 4 JUDGMENT IN A CIVIL CASE. (FDS, ilcd)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Judge James E. Shadid on 8/14/19. Petitioner filed a Motion filed a Motion to Vacate, Set Aside, or Correct Sentence pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2255, which this Court forwarded to the Court of Appeals as a request for permission to file a successive motion pursuant to 2255(h). The Court of Appeals has now issued its order #3 denying authorization. Accordingly, Motion #1 is DISMISSED, and this case is CLOSED.(FDS, ilcd)
August 9, 2019 Filing 3 USCA ORDER re #1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) filed by William L Whitefield. We therefore DENY authorization and DISMISS Whitefield's application. See full written Order. (VH, ilcd)
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER entered by Judge James E. Shadid on 8/7/2019. Petitioner has filed a Motion to Vacate, Set Aside, or Correct Sentence pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2255 in light of United States v. Davis, 139 S. Ct. 2319 (2019). As Petitioner has already filed an initial 2255 Motion, see Whitefield v. USA, Case No. 06-cv-2053 (C.D. Il.), this is a successive motion. Petitioner has not yet obtained permission from the Court of Appeals pursuant to 2255(h) to file such a motion. Therefore, the Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to forward the Motion #1 to the Court of Appeals as a request for permission to file a successive motion. This case is STAYED pending the Court of Appeals decision. (RK, ilcd)
July 29, 2019 Filing 2 Remark: Indictment in Criminal Case No. 04-20003 (Attachments: #1 Judgment and Commitment Order) (RK, ilcd)
July 29, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255), filed by William L Whitefield. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(RK, ilcd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Whitefield v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: William L Whitefield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: USA
Represented By: Eugene L Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?