Montemayor v. Kankakee County et al
Plaintiff: Javier Montemayor
Defendant: C/O Black, Kankakee County, Michael D Downey, C/O Long, C/O Harris and C/O Johnson
Case Number: 2:2019cv02231
Filed: August 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Colin Stirling Bruce
Referring Judge: Jonathan E Hawley
2 Judge: Eric I Long
3 Judge: Joe Billy McDade
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison Conditions
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE of Service/Counsel re #10 Amended Complaint by Louis J Meyer on behalf of Javier Montemayor (Meyer, Louis)
October 9, 2019 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Javier Montemayor.(Meyer, Louis)
September 9, 2019 Judge Joe Billy McDade and Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley added pursuant to procedure. Judge Colin Stirling Bruce and Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long no longer assigned to case. (KE, ilcd)
August 26, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Daniel P Kiss on behalf of Javier Montemayor (Kiss, Daniel)
August 23, 2019 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF SERVICE and Notice of Lawsuit sent to C/O Long on 08/23/2019. (Meyer, Louis)
August 23, 2019 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF SERVICE and Notice of Lawsuit sent to C/O Johnson on 08/23/2019. (Meyer, Louis)
August 23, 2019 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF SERVICE and Notice of Lawsuit sent to C/O Black on 08/23/2019. (Meyer, Louis)
August 23, 2019 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF SERVICE and Notice of Lawsuit sent to C/O Harris on 08/23/2019. (Meyer, Louis)
August 23, 2019 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF SERVICE and Notice of Lawsuit sent to Sheriff Downey on 08/23/2019. (Meyer, Louis)
August 23, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF SERVICE and Notice of Lawsuit sent to Kankakee County on 08/23/2019. (Meyer, Louis)
August 23, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Louis J Meyer on behalf of Javier Montemayor (Meyer, Louis)
August 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0753-3179173.), filed by Javier Montemayor. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet civil cover sheet)(Meyer, Louis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Montemayor v. Kankakee County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Javier Montemayor
Represented By: Louis J Meyer
Represented By: Daniel P Kiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C/O Black
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kankakee County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael D Downey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C/O Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C/O Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C/O Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?